Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970393

EP0970393 - SEISMIC SURVEYING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.06.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.07.2002  [2002/31]
Applicant(s)For:DE  IT  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola / VG
For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For:DE  IT  NL 
SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS LIMITED
P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola / VG
For:FR 
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER
42, rue Saint-Dominique
F-75007 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ZUURBIER, Nico
Kristian Bognerudsvei 6
N-0956 Oslo / NO
02 / BRAGSTAD, Helge
Linderudgrenda 18
N-1353 Barums Verk / NO
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Stoole, Brian David
Geco-Prakla Technical Services Inc, Patent Department Schlumberger House Buckingham Gate Gatwick
West Sussex RH6 0NZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Stoole, Brian David
Geco-Prakla Technical Services Inc, Patent Department, Schlumberger House, Buckingham Gate
Gatwick, West Sussex RH6 0NZ / GB
Application number, filing date98907110.519.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998IB00411
Priority number, dateGB1997000620425.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9706204
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843117
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970393
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01V1/22, G01V1/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   NL [2000/02]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM FUR SEISMISCHE VERMESSUNG[2000/02]
English:SEISMIC SURVEYING[2000/02]
French:PROCESSUS DE PROSPECTION SISMIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase26.08.1999National basic fee paid 
26.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
10.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/31]
27.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[PY]WO9713164  (CHEVRON USA INC [US]) [PY] 1,8 * page 32, line 6 - line 10 * * page 2, line 5 - line 14 *;
 [Y]US5568385  (SHELTON WILLIAM A [US]) [Y] 1,8 * column 3, line 35 - line 42 * * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - column 4, line 50 *;
 [A]US5450370  (BEASLEY CRAIG J [US], et al) [A] 1-4,8-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 12 * * column 3, line 46 - line 56 * * column 6, line 27 - line 33 *
 [XY]  - GEORGE D, "DATA COMPRESSION BREAKTHROUGH MAKES REAL-TIME SEISMIC EVALUATION A REALITY", OFFSHORE, (19960301), vol. 56, no. 3, page 33, XP000596440 [X] 1,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2-7,9-14
 [Y]  - BRUNE R.H. ET AL, "comprehensive analysis of marine 3-D bin coverage", LEADING EDGE, (19940701), vol. 13, no. 7, pages 757 - 762, XP002071184 [Y] 2,3,9,10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1437034
 [Y]  - MARTIN L E M, "Red hot Java", INTERNET REFERENCE SERVICES QUARTERLY, 1996, HAWORTH PRESS, NETHERLANDS, ISSN 1087-5301, vol. 1, no. 4, pages 89 - 95, XP002071185 [Y] 4-7,11-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1300/J136v01n04_12
 [A]  - LAU T, "Building a hypermedia information system on the Internet", IPCC 94 PROCEEDINGS. SCALING NEW HEIGHTS IN TECHNICAL COMMUNICATION (CAT. NO.94CH3442-1), IPCC 94 PROCEEDINGS. SCALING NEW HEIGHTS IN TECHNICAL COMMUNICATION, BANFF, ALTA., CANADA, 28 SEPT.-1 OCT. 1994, ISBN 0-7803-1936-2, 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 192 - 197, XP002071186 [A] 1,4-8,11-14 * abstract *