Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002515114 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | IB9800427 | 23.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU735392C | Global Dossier | 16.05.2002 | C | AU735392B | 05.07.2001 | B2 | AU6306698 | 20.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | IB9800427 | 23.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0970255 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2001 | B1 | EP0970255 | 12.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | IB9800427 | 23.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE209699T | 15.12.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | IB9800427 | 23.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9808085 | 08.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | IB9800427 | 23.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2285051 | 01.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | IB9800427 | 23.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69802671T | 22.08.2002 | T2 | DE69802671D1 | 10.01.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | IB9800427 | 23.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1304325 | 15.03.2001 | B1 | ITGO970007 | 26.09.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1304335 | 15.03.2001 | B1 | ITGO970019 | 10.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010005553 | 15.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | IB9800427 | 23.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6163561 | 19.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | IB9800427 | 23.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9842880 | Global Dossier | 01.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR012166 | 27.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2166147T | 01.04.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID22749A | 09.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW445297B | 11.07.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | ITGO970019 | 10.09.1997 | ITGO970007 | 26.03.1997 |