Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970255

EP0970255 - COOLED BASKET FOR STEEL PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.10.2002
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A.
Via Nazionale, 19
33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / BENEDETTI, Giampietro
Strada degli Aceri, 32
I-33030 Campoformido / IT
02 / PAVLICEVIC, Milorad
Via Pracchiuso, 31/7
I-33100 Udine / IT
03 / POLONI, Alfredo
Via Generale Paolini, 29
I-34070 Fogliano di Redipuglia / IT
04 / GENSINI, Gianni
Via Vidoni, 32, Quartiere Industriale 2
I-33030 Buia / IT
05 / DELLA NEGRA, Angelico
Via Ellero, 23
I-33040 Povoletto / IT
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2
33100 Udine / IT
Application number, filing date98907126.123.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998IB00427
Priority number, dateIT1997GO0000726.03.1997         Original published format: IT GO970007
IT1997GO0001910.09.1997         Original published format: IT GO970019
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842880
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970255
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970255
Date:28.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C21C5/56, F27D13/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:GEKÜHLTEN KORB FÜR STAHLWERKSANLAGEN[2000/02]
English:COOLED BASKET FOR STEEL PLANTS[2000/02]
French:BENNE REFROIDIE POUR FOURNEAUX[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase01.10.1999National basic fee paid 
01.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
22.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2001Fee for grant paid
29.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE28.11.2001
CH28.11.2001
FI28.11.2001
FR28.11.2001
GR28.11.2001
LI28.11.2001
NL28.11.2001
SE28.02.2002
GB23.03.2002
[2006/14]
Former [2003/17]BE28.11.2001
CH28.11.2001
FI28.11.2001
GR28.11.2001
LI28.11.2001
NL28.11.2001
SE28.02.2002
GB23.03.2002
Former [2003/06]BE28.11.2001
CH28.11.2001
FI28.11.2001
GR28.11.2001
LI28.11.2001
NL28.11.2001
SE28.02.2002
Former [2003/01]CH28.11.2001
FI28.11.2001
GR28.11.2001
LI28.11.2001
SE28.02.2002
Former [2002/49]FI28.11.2001
GR28.11.2001
SE28.02.2002
Former [2002/33]FI28.11.2001
SE28.02.2002
Former [2002/27]SE28.02.2002
Cited inInternational search[XD]US5106063  (GRANSTROEM STAFFAN [SE]) [XD] 1,4,5,7 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4690638  (NAKAGAWA FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US3880648  (FORREST ALEXANDER C) [A] 21 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0592723  (CONSTEEL SA [CH]) [A] 21 * figure 1; claim - *;
 [A]WO9632616  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 25 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4506370  (YOSHIMATSU YOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 25 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US3336020  (PALSAK ANDREW M) [A] * column 3, line 13 - line 15 *;
 [A]GB1209507  (INGENICR GUNNAR SCHJELDERUP IN, et al)
 [A]  - LIUYI ZHANG UND FRANZ OETERS, "stimulationsmodell zur berechnung der schrottvorwärmung mit gestufter nachverbrennung", STAHL UND EISEN, DUSSELDORF, (19950515), vol. 115, no. 5, pages 75 - 82, XP000511498 [A] 20