Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973678

EP0973678 - MULTI-LAYERED PLASTIC CONTAINER PROVIDING GOOD PRODUCT DRAINAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.03.2009
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HILDEBRAND, Richard, Emil, IV
1440 West Kemper Road 1208
Cincinnati, OH 45240 / US
02 / KISSNER, Robert, Joseph
10722 Silverbrook Drive
Cincinnati, OH 45240 / US
03 / ZAMORA, Pauline Cruz
Unit E, 7 Harbor Point Drive
Mill Valley, CA 94941 / US
04 / HATTORI, Tomokazu
1-8-14-202, Tanaka-cho
Higashinada-ku, Kobe 658 / JP
05 / FURUMICHI, Hiroshi
248-20, Oka, Inami-cho
Kako-gun, Hyogo 675-11 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Veronese, Pancrazio , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A.
Centro Tecnico di Sambuceto
Via Aterno 128/130
Sambuceto
66020 San Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Veronese, Pancrazio , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Centro Tecnico di Sambuceto Via Aterno 128/130
66020 San Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT
Former [2005/15]Veronese, Pancrazio , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 128/130
66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino / IT
Former [2000/04]Engisch, Gautier , et al
BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date98907140.224.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998IB00442
Priority number, dateUS1997082927731.03.1997         Original published format: US 829277
US19970005138P31.03.1997         Original published format: US 5138 P
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843881
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973678
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search reportEP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65D1/02, B65D23/02
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:MEHRSCHICHTIGER KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER MIT EINER VERBESSERTEN ENTLEERUNG[2000/04]
English:MULTI-LAYERED PLASTIC CONTAINER PROVIDING GOOD PRODUCT DRAINAGE[2000/04]
French:CONTENEUR EN PLASTIQUE MULTICOUCHES ASSURANT UNE BONNE EVACUATION DES PRODUITS[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999National basic fee paid 
27.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
11.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/15]
13.11.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200811   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0673758  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-10;
 [Y]US3221954  (LUX JOHN H) [Y] 2-4,7,10 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 23 * * column 3, line 44 - line 48 *;
 [Y]DE4415549  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 5,6,8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB1414382  (ICI LTD) [Y] 9 * page 3, line 11 - line 19 *;
 [X]JPH0811929  ;
 [A]US4832211  (MATTHEWS WALTER A [CA], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]DE19505700  (LASKOWSKI SIGISMUND [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 96, no. 9, [X] 1 * abstract *