EP0982579 - DEVICE FOR INSPECTING BEARINGS OF MAIN MOTORS OF ROLLING STOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/09] | DEVICES FOR INSPECTING BEARINGS OF MAIN MOTORS OF ROLLING STOCK | ||
[2007/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Central Japan Railway Company 1-4, Meieki 1-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-0002 / JP | [2007/22] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Central Japan Railway Company 1-4, Meieki 1-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 450-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Hiroyuki Central Japan Railway Company 1-4, Meieki 1-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-0002 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Hiromitsu Central Japan Railway Company 1-4, Meieki 1-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-0002 / JP | 03 /
ARIGA, Tatsuya Central Japan Railway Company 1-4, Meieki 1-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-0002 / JP | 04 /
UCHIDA, Mitsunori Central Japan Railway Company 1-4, Meieki 1-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-0002 / JP | 05 /
IKEDA, Shinichi Central Japan Railway Company 1-4, Meieki 1-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-0002 / JP | 06 /
YAJIMA, Kazuki Central Japan Railway Company 1-4, Meieki 1-chome Nakamura-shi Aichi 450-0002 / JP | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/09] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten & Roth Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98907249.1 | 16.03.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998JP01103 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947904 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982579 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982579 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01M13/04 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
G01M13/045 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2000/09] | G01M13/04, G01H17/00, G01M17/00, G01N23/223 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/10] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRÜFUNG DER HAUPTMOTORENLAGER IN SCHIENENFAHRZEUGEN | [2000/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR INSPECTING BEARINGS OF MAIN MOTORS OF ROLLING STOCK | [2007/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR INSPECTER LES PALIERS DES MOTEURS PRINCIPAUX DES VEHICULES A RAILS | [2007/02] |
Former [2000/09] | DEVICES FOR INSPECTING BEARINGS OF MAIN MOTORS OF ROLLING STOCK | ||
Former [2000/09] | DISPOSITIFS POUR INSPECTER LES PALIERS DES MOTEURS PRINCIPAUX D'UN MATERIEL ROULANT | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1998 | Translation filed | 17.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1998 | Search fee paid | 20.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 23.03.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.04.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4366544 (SHIMA ICHIJI, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 3-8 * * column 2, lines 12-14 * * column 2, lines 52-63 * * column 3, line 17 * * claim 4 * * figure 2 *; | [X]JPS62270820 ; | [XY]JPS54104883 ; | [X]US4620185 (PLAHMER THOMAS G [US]) [X] 9 * column 2, lines 23-29 * * column 3, lines 17-26 *; | [X]GB2269638 (RKS [FR]) [X] 10,11 * column 1, lines 15-18 *; | [X]JPS56166444 ; | [Y]JPH0432737 ; | [A]US3183500 (HORNBOSTEL JR LLOYD, et al) [A] 10,11 * column 1, lines 31-36 * * column 1, lines 44-56 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880510), vol. 012, no. 149, Database accession no. (M - 694), & JP62270820 A 19871125 (NIPPON KOKAN KK | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19791023), vol. 003, no. 127, Database accession no. (E - 146), & JP54104883 A 19790817 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 4 * abstract * [Y] 5-7 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820408), vol. 006, no. 053, Database accession no. (P - 109), & JP56166444 A 19811221 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 10,11 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920514), vol. 016, no. 201, Database accession no. (P - 1352), & JP04032737 A 19920204 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD; others: 01) [Y] 5-7 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS55138634 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al); | [X]JPH03291539 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JPS6083928U ; | [X]JPS54104883 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JPS6112596B ; | [X]JPS6258133 (REXNORD INC) |