blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1004426

EP1004426 - METHOD OF BONDING AND MOLDING MODIFIED POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE MOLDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-0015 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Daikin Industries, Limited
Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0015 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SHIRASAKI, Osamu, Yodogawa Works, Daikin Ind. Ltd
1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0044 / JP
02 / KAWACHI, Shoji, Yodogawa Works, Daikin Ind. Ltd
1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0044 / JP
03 / TANIGAWA, Shingo, Yodogawa Works, Daikin Ind. Ltd
1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0044 / JP
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98907263.217.03.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998JP01117
Priority number, dateJP1997009762917.03.1997         Original published format: JP 9762997
[2000/22]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9841383
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1004426
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:B29C65/02, B29C65/78, B29C53/36, B29C51/12, C08F214/26, B29C65/00, B29C41/06, B29C41/20, B29D22/00
[2000/27]
CPC:
B29C66/53462 (EP); B29C65/02 (EP); B29C65/7802 (EP);
B29C66/112 (EP); B29C66/114 (EP); B29C66/5344 (EP);
B29C66/543 (EP); B29C66/545 (EP); B29C66/71 (EP);
C08J5/121 (EP); B29C41/042 (EP); B29C66/7212 (EP);
B29K2027/18 (EP); B29L2031/712 (EP); C08J2327/18 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
B29C66/71, B29K2027/18 (EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/08 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/22]B29C65/02, B29C65/78, B29C53/36, B29C51/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/22]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN UND FORMEN VON FORMLINGEN AUS MODIFIZIERTEM POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLEN[2000/22]
English:METHOD OF BONDING AND MOLDING MODIFIED POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE MOLDINGS[2000/22]
French:PROCEDE DE LIAISON ET DE MOULAGE D'ARTICLES MOULES EN POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE MODIFIE[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase07.10.1999Translation filed 
07.10.1999National basic fee paid 
07.10.1999Search fee paid 
07.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
07.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/22]
17.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
12.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/50]
22.07.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0272659  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, lines 32-37 - page 3, lines 29-32 *;
 [A]US4774304  (KUHLS JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-10 *
International search[X]JPH04357015  (DAIKIN IND LTD);
 [A]JPS63274529  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [A]JPH0591835U  ;
 [Y]JPH05500780
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.