Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0988853

EP0988853 - COSMETIC PREPARATION, SILICA-COATED METAL OXIDE POWDER, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.2013
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHOWA DENKO K.K.
13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
[2012/43]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
Showa Denko Kabushiki Kaisha
13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ISHII, Nobuaki, Showa Denko K.K. Central Res. Lab.
Prod. Tech. Cter
5-1, Okawa-cho
Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0858 / JP
02 / WADA, Koichi, Showa Denko K.K. Central Res. Lab.
Prod. Tech. Cter
5-1, Okawa-cho
Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0858 / JP
03 / SEKIGUCHI, Kazuo, Showa Denko K.K. Cetrl Res., Lab
Prod. Tech. Cter
5-1, Okawa-cho
Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0858 / JP
04 / TAKAMA, Michihiro
Showa Denko K.K.
13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
05 / ITO, Shinobu
Showa Denko K.K.
13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome
Minoto-ku, Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
06 / YANO, Kotaro, Showa Denko K.K. Central Res. Lab.
1-1, Ohnodai 1-chome
Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP
07 / SAITO, Yasuo, Showa Denko K.K. Chichibu Works
1505, Oaza Shimokagemori
Chichibu-shi, Saitama 369-187 / JP
08 / KAWASAKI, Keiji, Showa Denko K.K. Central Res. Lab
1-1, Ohnodai 1-chome
Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP
 [2012/43]
Former [2000/13]01 / ISHII, Nobuaki, Showa Denko K.K. Central Res. Lab.
Prod. Tech. Cter, 5-1, Okawa-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0858 / JP
02 / WADA, Koichi, Showa Denko K.K. Central Res. Lab.
Prod. Tech. Cter, 5-1, Okawa-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0858 / JP
03 / SEKIGUCHI, Kazuo, Showa Denko K.K. Cetrl Res., Lab
Prod. Tech. Cter, 5-1, Okawa-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0858 / JP
04 / TAKAMA, Michihiro
Showa Denko K.K., 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
05 / ITO, Shinobu
Showa Denko K.K., 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome
Minoto-ku, Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
06 / YANO, Kotaro, Showa Denko K.K. Central Res. Lab.
1-1, Ohnodai 1-chome, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP
07 / SAITO, Yasuo, Showa Denko K.K. Chichibu Works
1505, Oaza Shimokagemori
Chichibu-shi, Saitama 369-187 / JP
08 / KAWASAKI, Keiji, Showa Denko K.K. Central Res. Lab
1-1, Ohnodai 1-chome, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[2012/43]
Former [2000/13]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98907278.017.03.1998
[2000/13]
WO1998JP01133
Priority number, dateJP1997010193018.04.1997         Original published format: JP 10193097
US19970054965P07.08.1997         Original published format: US 54965 P
JP1997033480420.11.1997         Original published format: JP 33480497
US19980071434P14.01.1998         Original published format: US 71434 P
[2000/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847476
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0988853
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0988853
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/29, C09C1/36, C09C3/06
[2012/28]
Former International [2000/13]A61K7/42
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/13]
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, SILICA BESCHICHTETES METALLOXIDPULVER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN[2000/13]
English:COSMETIC PREPARATION, SILICA-COATED METAL OXIDE POWDER, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2000/13]
French:PREPARATION COSMETIQUE, POUDRE D'OXYDE DE METAL RECOUVERTE DE SILICE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION[2000/13]
Entry into regional phase18.10.1999Translation filed 
18.10.1999National basic fee paid 
18.10.1999Search fee paid 
18.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
18.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/13]
05.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2012Fee for grant paid
10.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.10.2009
Opposition(s)25.07.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
29.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
GB17.03.2013
IE17.03.2013
LU17.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/09]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
GB17.03.2013
IE17.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2014/08]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
IE17.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2014/07]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
IE17.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/47]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
ES04.02.2013
Former [2013/21]SE24.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0953610  (CATALYSTS & CHEM IND CO [JP]) [E] 1-25 * page 3, line 42 - line 46; claims 1,2 * * page 3, line 51 * * page 4, line 30 - line 31 * * page 4, line 49 - line 55 * * page 4, line 55 - line 57 *;
 [A]  BRINKER C JEFFREY ET AL, "INFRARED INVESTIGATIONS OF FRAMEWORK SILICATE STRUCTURES. IR-RAMAN INVESTIGATIONS OF GEL DEHYDROXYLATION. PASSAGES", SOL-GEL SCIENCE: THE PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY OF SOL-GEL PROCESSING, ACADEMIC PRESS, BOSTON, (19900101), ISBN 978-0-12-134970-7, pages 581 - 583, XP008104140 [A] 12,19,25
 [A]  LISA KLEIN, Sol-Gel Technology, WILLIAM ANDREW PUBLISHING/NOYES, XP002520604 [A] 12,19,25 * page 215 - page 217 *
International search[X]EP0581651  (SUZUKI YUSHI KOGYO KK [JP], et al);
 [X]JPH08104606  (TEIKA CORP)
ExaminationEP0581651
by applicant   - C. JEFFEREY BRINKER, SOL-GEL SCIENCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, pages 581 - 583,
    - MANABU KIYONO, Titanium Oxide-Physical Properties and Applied Technology, GIHO-DO-SHUPPAN, pages 196 - 197,