Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968524

EP0968524 - ATMOSPHERIC-PRESSURE PLASMA JET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.12.2007
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
Mail Stop D412
Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US
For all designated states
Selwyn, Gary S.
823 Scott Way
Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
Mail Stop D412
Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US
For all designated states
Selwyn, Gary S.
823 Scott Way
Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SELWYN, Gary, S.
823 Scott Way
Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Thomson, Paul Anthony , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Thomson, Paul Anthony , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date98907326.723.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US01269
Priority number, dateUS1997078762123.01.1997         Original published format: US 787621
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9835379
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968524
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/30, H01L21/302, H05H1/24
[2003/29]
Former International [2000/01]H01L21/30, H01L21/302
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:PLASMASTRAHL MIT ATMOSPHÄRENDRUCK[2000/01]
English:ATMOSPHERIC-PRESSURE PLASMA JET[2000/01]
French:JET DE PLASMA A PRESSION ATMOSPHERIQUE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase21.07.1999National basic fee paid 
21.07.1999Search fee paid 
21.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
24.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2007
31.07.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.08.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/02]
04.09.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/02]
07.11.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Request for further processing for:14.09.2006Request for further processing filed
14.09.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.09.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
18.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
24.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
16.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH06108257
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940722), vol. 018, no. 392, Database accession no. (C - 1228), & JP06108257 A 19940419 (MASUHIRO KOKOMA;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,11,12,22 * abstract *
International search[A]US5198724  ;
 [A]US5372674  ;
 [X]US5369336