Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981624

EP0981624 - LEISHMANIA ANTIGENS FOR USE IN THE THERAPY AND DIAGNOSIS OF LEISHMANIASIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/09]$i(LEISHMANIA) ANTIGENS FOR USE IN THE THERAPY AND DIAGNOSIS OF LEISHMANIASIS
[2000/30]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CORIXA CORPORATION
Suite 200, 1124 Columbia Street
Seattle, WA 98104 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
CORIXA CORPORATION
Suite 200, 1124 Columbia Street
Seattle, WA 98104 / US
Inventor(s)01 / REED, Steven, G.
2843 122nd Place N.E.
Bellevue, WA 98005 / US
02 / CAMPOS-NETO, Antonio
9308 Midship Court N.E.
Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US
03 / WEBB, John, R.
15314 Silverfirs Drive
Everett, WA 98208 / US
04 / DILLON, Davin, C.
21607 N.E. 24th Street
Redmond, WA 98053 / US
05 / SKEIKY, Yasir, A.
8327 - 25th Avenue N.W.
Seattle, WA 98107 / US
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/09]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98907489.312.02.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998US03002
Priority number, dateUS1997079884112.02.1997         Original published format: US 798841
US1997092060927.08.1997         Original published format: US 920609
[2000/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9835045
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0981624
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/30, C07K14/44, C12N15/63, C12N5/10, A61K39/008, A61K48/00
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/09]
TitleGerman:LEISHMANIA ANTIGENE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN LEISHMANIASIS THERAPIE UND DIAGNOSE[2000/09]
English:LEISHMANIA ANTIGENS FOR USE IN THE THERAPY AND DIAGNOSIS OF LEISHMANIASIS[2000/30]
French:ANTIGENES LEISHMANIA UTILISES DANS LE TRAITEMENT ET LE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA LEISHMANIOSE[2000/30]
Former [2000/09]$i(LEISHMANIA) ANTIGENS FOR USE IN THE THERAPY AND DIAGNOSIS OF LEISHMANIASIS
Former [2000/09]ANTIGENES $i(LEISHMANIA) UTILISES DANS LE TRAITEMENT ET LE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA LEISHMANIOSE
Entry into regional phase10.09.1999National basic fee paid 
10.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/31]
17.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/31]
Divisional application(s)EP01101398.4  / EP1113073
EP04000341.0  / EP1422238
EP10177490.9  / EP2284186
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9529239  (CORIXA CORP [US]) [A] 1-6,25,27-29,31,35-40,42-55 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 37 * * page 5, line 8 - page 23, line 9; example - *;
 [PX]WO9711180  (CORIXA CORP [US]) [PX] 1-6,25,27-29,31,35-40,42-55 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 37 * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 20 * * page 9, line 4 - line 19 * * page 12, line 20 - page 14, line 17 * * page 15, line 3 - page 16, line 26 * * page 17, line 8 - line 30; examples 1,7,8; claim - *