Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0960468

EP0960468 - MULTI-DECK POWER CONVERTER MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.12.2006
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.01.2007  [2007/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Power Devices, Inc.
20 Linden Street
Boston, MA 02134 / US
[1999/48]
Inventor(s)01 / LU, Qun
410 Waltham Street
Lexington, MA 02173 / US
02 / GRANDMONT, Paul, E.
46 Woodlawn Circle
Whitman, MA 02382-2328 / US
03 / LIU, Shih-Chang
12 Lake Street
Brighton, MA 02135 / US
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Former [1999/48]Bockhorni, Josef, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Application number, filing date98907508.019.02.1998
[1999/48]
WO1998US03115
Priority number, dateUS1997080398021.02.1997         Original published format: US 803980
[1999/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9837619
Date:27.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0960468
Date:01.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998
[1999/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02M1/00, H02M7/00
[2000/02]
Former International [1999/48]H02M1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/48]
TitleGerman:MEHRSTÖCKIGES STROMWANDLERMODUL[1999/48]
English:MULTI-DECK POWER CONVERTER MODULE[1999/48]
French:MODULE CONVERTISSEUR DE COURANT A PLUSIEURS ETAGES[1999/48]
Entry into regional phase17.08.1999National basic fee paid 
17.08.1999Search fee paid 
17.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/48]
26.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200104   M06   Fee paid on   20.04.2001
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]US4908738  (KOBARI KATSUO [JP], et al);
 [A]US5418688  (HERTZ ALLEN D [US], et al);
 [A]US5497291  (HOSEN TORU [JP]);
 [A]US5579217  (DEAM DAVID [US], et al)