Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1023429

EP1023429 - FABRIC COLOR PROTECTION COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHODIA INC.
CN 7500, 259 Prospect Plains Road Cranbury
New Jersey 08512-7500 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
RHODIA INC.
CN 7500, 259 Prospect Plains Road
Cranbury, New Jersey 08512-7500 / US
Inventor(s)01 / POPOFF, Christine
7 Marseille Terrace
Morganville, NJ 07751 / US
02 / NARTEY, Alwyn
1105 Deer Creek Drive
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
03 / GABRIEL, Robert
2 Millar Court
Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US
04 / AUBAY, Eric
14, avenue Gallieni
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Fabre, Madeleine-France
RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq
93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
[2008/32]
Former [2000/31]Fabre, Madeleine-France
RHODIA SERVICES, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25, quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98907556.920.02.1998
[2000/31]
WO1998US03366
Priority number, dateUS1997003829921.02.1997         Original published format: US 38299
[2000/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9839401
Date:11.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1023429
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998
[2000/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1023429
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/37, C11D17/06, C11D17/00
[2000/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/31]
Extension statesAL21.07.1999
LT21.07.1999
LV21.07.1999
MK21.07.1999
RO21.07.1999
SI21.07.1999
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM SCHUTZ VON GEWEBEFARBEN SOWIE VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2000/31]
English:FABRIC COLOR PROTECTION COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS[2000/31]
French:COMPOSITIONS PROTEGEANT LES COULEURS DES TISSUS ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANTS[2000/31]
Entry into regional phase21.07.1999National basic fee paid 
21.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/31]
07.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2005Fee for grant paid
09.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
IT11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
[2008/15]
Former [2006/22]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2006/14]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2006/13]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
Former [2005/52]FI11.05.2005
SE11.08.2005
Former [2005/50]SE11.08.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH0867896  ;
 [X]GB2006257  (PQ CORP) [X] 14,15 * examples 4D-7,D-8; claims 1-6; table 1 *;
 [X]FR2713237  (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [X] 14,15 * example 2; claim - *
 [X]  - "Rinse assistant for laundry detergent compsns - contains aminoalkyl-modified silicone oil(s) and inorganic silica and/or its deriv., and controls foaming in washing process", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 20, Database accession no. 96-196723, XP002067064 & JPH0867896 A 00000000 (KAO CORP) [X] 14,15 * abstract *