blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0968247 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0968247



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 108
22.01.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 2
09.10.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
27.05.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.05.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.04.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
09.06.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
26.04.2000 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
20.04.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
20.04.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.04.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.09.1999 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
07.09.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.09.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.09.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.08.1999 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
25.08.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.08.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.08.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
23.08.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.02.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.02.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 26
04.12.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 20
18.08.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
18.08.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 24