blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0968247


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.01.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  12.03.2003  [2003/11]
04.10.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn
24.05.2002 First examination report
22.05.2002 Examination report or reply
03.04.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
26.02.2001 Renewal fee
20.04.2000 Supplementary search report published on  07.06.2000 [2000/23]
20.04.2000 Change - classification published on  07.06.2000 [2000/23]
29.02.2000 Renewal fee
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
19.11.1999 Request for examination filed published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
03.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
31.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
28.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication