blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0968247
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001513125Global Dossier 28.08.2001A
Priority number Date
US9803399 11.02.1998
US80371697 21.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0968247Global Dossier 07.06.2000A4
EP0968247 05.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9803399 11.02.1998
US80371697 21.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2282603 27.08.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9803399 11.02.1998
US80371697 21.02.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9837136Global Dossier 27.08.1998A1
Priority number Date
US80371697 21.02.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1250457 12.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US80371697 21.02.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5783614 21.07.1998A
Priority number Date
US80371697 21.02.1997