Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968247

EP0968247 - POLYMERIC-COATED DIELECTRIC PARTICLES AND FORMULATION AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COPYTELE INC.
900 Walt Whitman Road Huntington Station
New York 11746 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
COPYTELE INC.
900 Walt Whitman Road
Huntington Station New York 11746 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Jing, Hong
Apartment 2, 315 W. Packer Avenue
Bethlehem, PA 18015 / US
02 / SCHUBERT, Frederic, E.
18 Cordwood Path
Shoreham, NY 11786 / US
03 / HOU, Wei-Hsin
46 Buckingham Meadow Road
Setauket, NY 11733 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)de Beaumont, Michel
1bis, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98907569.211.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US03399
Priority number, dateUS1997080371621.02.1997         Original published format: US 803716
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9837136
Date:27.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968247
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08K9/04, G03G17/04, C09B67/08
[2000/23]
Former International [2000/01]C08K9/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:MIT POLYMER BESCHICHTETE DIELEKTRISCHE TEILCHEN, MISCHUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2000/01]
English:POLYMERIC-COATED DIELECTRIC PARTICLES AND FORMULATION AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME[2000/01]
French:PARTICULES DIELECTRIQUES ENROBEES DE POLYMERE, COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ASSOCIES[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase23.08.1999National basic fee paid 
23.08.1999Search fee paid 
23.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
27.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/11]
09.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4285801  (CHIANG ANNE A) [DA] 1-16 * example - *;
 [DA]US4298448  (MUELLER KLAUS, et al) [DA] 1,8 * example - *;
 [A]US5484681  (CUNNINGHAM MICHAEL F [CA], et al) [A] 1 * column 10, line 27 - line 28 * * column 11, line 32 - line 33 * * examples I,IV,VIII *;
 [A]WO9502636  (COPYTELE INC [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *;
 [D]US5380362  (SCHUBERT FREDERIC E [US]);
 [A]US5034298  (BERKES JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 11, line 3 - column 12, line 50 * * claims 21,33 *
International search[Y]US4960677