Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967984

EP0967984 - COMPOSITION FOR TREATING CANCER AND IMMUNOLOGICAL DISORDERS RESULTING IN CHRONIC CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING CANCER AND IMMUNOLOGICAL DISORDERS RESULTING IN CHRONIC CONDITIONS
[2001/44]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.09.2002
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.11.2002  [2002/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Peregrine Pharmaceutical, Inc.
4670 Highland Drive
Gainesville, GA 30506 / US
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / GERMANO, Yveta
56 Town Green Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)des Termes, Monique
BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Des Termes, Monique
c/o Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98907646.827.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US03771
Priority number, dateUS19970039288P04.03.1997         Original published format: US 39288 P
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9839013
Date:11.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967984
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/70, A61P35/00, A61P37/00
[2001/44]
Former International [2000/01]A61K31/70
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/01]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS UND IMMUNKRANKHEITEN, DIE IN CHRONISCHE ERKRANKUNGEN RESULTIEREN[2001/44]
English:COMPOSITION FOR TREATING CANCER AND IMMUNOLOGICAL DISORDERS RESULTING IN CHRONIC CONDITIONS[2001/44]
French:COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER ET DES TROUBLES IMMUNOLOGIQUES DEBOUCHANT SUR DES ETATS CHRONIQUES[2001/44]
Former [2000/01]ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS UND IMMUNKRANKHEITEN, DIE IN CHRONISCHE ERKRANKUNGEN RESULTIEREN
Former [2000/01]COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING CANCER AND IMMUNOLOGICAL DISORDERS RESULTING IN CHRONIC CONDITIONS
Former [2000/01]COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER ET DE TROUBLES IMMUNOLOGIQUES DEBOUCHANT SUR DES ETATS CHRONIQUES
Entry into regional phase02.09.1999National basic fee paid 
02.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
08.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/46]
11.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2002/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9502398  (BLAZEK MARTIN [CZ], et al) [DX] 1-3 * page 3, paragraph 3; claims 1-4 * * page 2, paragraph 2 *;
 [XA]US4514387  (WISSLER JOSEF H [DE]) [X] 1-3 * table 8 * [A] 7,8;
 [X]CZ9200883  ;
 CZ9200883  [ ] (ALIATROS SRO [CS]);
 [A]WO9513061  (IMMUNAL KFT [HU], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 3, lines 13-17; claims 1,4-9,20 * * page 5, lines 23-28; example 112 * * page 12, lines 4-13 *;
 [A]FR2609893  (ROUGEREAU ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1-4,6 * page 2, lines 17-22; claims 1-4 * * page 3, lines 2-3; example 2 *;
 [A]JPS6466127  ;
 JPS6466127  [ ] (NICHIREI KK, et al);
 [A]JPH0625276  ;
 JPH0625276  [ ] (TANABE SEIYAKU CO)
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 13, Database accession no. 94-102084, XP002066481 & CZ9200883 A 19940216 (ALIVIZATOS C.) [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890616), vol. 013, no. 262, Database accession no. (C - 608), & JP01066127 A 19890313 (NICHIREI KK) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940506), vol. 018, no. 236, Database accession no. (C - 1196), & JP06025276 A 19940201 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO LTD) [A] 4 * abstract *