Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0970018 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0970018



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 87
13.05.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.05.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.04.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.04.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.04.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
28.03.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 8
15.01.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
22.12.2000 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.12.2000 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.12.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.12.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
01.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.08.1999 General authorisation Search / examination 1
25.08.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.12.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
14.12.1998 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
18.11.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
02.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 10
07.09.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
07.09.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 16