Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0970018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001514573Global Dossier 11.09.2001A
Priority number Date
AT9800061 10.03.1998
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0970018Global Dossier 04.07.2001B1
EP0970018 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
AT9800061 10.03.1998
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT202766T 15.07.2001T
Priority number Date
AT9800061 10.03.1998
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU728428B 11.01.2001B2
AU6601998 29.09.1998A
Priority number Date
AT9800061 10.03.1998
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2282507 17.09.1998A1
Priority number Date
AT9800061 10.03.1998
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59800965D 09.08.2001D1
Priority number Date
AT9800061 10.03.1998
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GR3036708T 31.12.2001T3
Priority number Date
AT9800061 10.03.1998
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1026191 17.10.2003A1
Priority number Date
AT9800061 10.03.1998
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL131714D 19.03.2001D0
Priority number Date
AT9800061 10.03.1998
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6165326 26.12.2000A
Priority number Date
AT9800061 10.03.1998
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9840313Global Dossier 17.09.1998A1
Priority number Date
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT404467B 25.11.1998B
ATA41797 15.04.1998A
Priority number Date
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1108993C 21.05.2003C
CN1250426 12.04.2000A
Priority number Date
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2158668T 01.09.2001T3
Priority number Date
AT41797 11.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT970018E 28.12.2001E
Priority number Date
AT41797 11.03.1997