Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970018

EP0970018 - FACILITY FOR DESALINATING OR PURIFYING SEA WATER OR BRACKISH WATER BY MEANS OF SOLAR ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Markopulos, Johannes
Leesdorferstrasse 101
2512 Tribuswinkel / AT
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Weiser, Andreas
Patentanwälte Schütz u.Partner Brigittenauer Lände 50
1200 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Weiser, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Schütz u.Partner, Schottenring 16, Börsegebäude
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date98907748.210.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998AT00061
Priority number, dateAT1997000041711.03.1997         Original published format: AT 41797
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840313
Date:17.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970018
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970018
Date:04.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/14
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   NL,   PT [2000/02]
Extension statesAL25.08.1999
TitleGerman:ANLAGE ZUR ENTSALZUNG ODER REINIGUNG VON MEER- ODER BRACKWASSER MITTELS SOLARENERGIE[2000/02]
English:FACILITY FOR DESALINATING OR PURIFYING SEA WATER OR BRACKISH WATER BY MEANS OF SOLAR ENERGY[2000/02]
French:INSTALLATION POUR DESSALER OU PURIFIER DE L'EAU DE MER OU DE L'EAU SAUMATRE AU MOYEN D'ENERGIE SOLAIRE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase25.08.1999National basic fee paid 
25.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
06.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2001Fee for grant paid
28.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR04.07.2001
GB04.07.2001
[2006/14]
Former [2002/18]GB04.07.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2002/16]GB04.07.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]WO8000077  (WARDEN, JOHN) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]US4209364  (ROTHSCHILD HERBERT F);
 [A]FR2379482  (DESSALEMENT EAU MER SA CIE POU);
 [A]FR2101951  (HASSLACHER JAMES)