Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968228

EP0968228 - CALCIUM PHOSPHOPEPTIDE COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.06.2014
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.07.2016  [2016/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of Melbourne
Grattan Street
Parkville, Victoria 3052 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]For all designated states
The University of Melbourne
Grattan Street
Parkville, Victoria 3052 / AU
Former [2002/30]For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF MELBOURNE
Level 4, Walter Boas Building
Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF MELBOURNE
Level 4, Walter Boas Building
Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU
For all designated states
THE VICTORIAN DAIRY INDUSTRY AUTHORITY
651-653 Victoria Street
Abbotsford, VIC 3067 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / REYNOLDS, Eric, C.
104 Hill Road
North Balwyn, VIC 3104 / AU
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[2012/49]
Former [2009/49]Ahner, Francis , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Former [2000/01]Ahner, Francis , et al
CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98907752.413.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998AU00160
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0566213.03.1997         Original published format: AU PO566297
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840406
Date:17.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968228
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968228
Date:21.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU17.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/24, A61K33/42
[2012/46]
Former International [2004/17]C07K14/47, A61K7/16
Former International [2000/01]C07K14/47, C07K101/02, C01B25/32, A61K7/16, A61K33/42, A61K38/08, A61K38/16, A61K38/17
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:KALZIUM-PHOSPHOPEPTID-KOMPLEXE.[2000/02]
English:CALCIUM PHOSPHOPEPTIDE COMPLEXES[2000/01]
French:COMPLEXES DE CALCIUM ET DE PHOSPHOPEPTIDES[2000/01]
Former [2000/01]CALCIUMPHOSPHOPEPTIDKOMPLEXE
Entry into regional phase11.10.1999National basic fee paid 
11.10.1999Search fee paid 
11.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
11.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
13.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2013Fee for grant paid
08.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10184405.8  / EP2343314
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2004
Opposition(s)22.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
16.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.08.2013
BE21.08.2013
FI21.08.2013
MC21.08.2013
SE21.08.2013
IE13.03.2014
LU13.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2016/27]
Former [2015/08]AT21.08.2013
BE21.08.2013
FI21.08.2013
SE21.08.2013
IE13.03.2014
LU13.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT21.08.2013
BE21.08.2013
FI21.08.2013
SE21.08.2013
IE13.03.2014
LU13.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT21.08.2013
BE21.08.2013
FI21.08.2013
SE21.08.2013
LU13.03.2014
Former [2014/14]AT21.08.2013
BE21.08.2013
FI21.08.2013
SE21.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT21.08.2013
FI21.08.2013
SE21.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT21.08.2013
SE21.08.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9303707  (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al) [X] 7,8,10,11,14-16,29 * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 1 * * example 2 *
International search[X]WO9400146  (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al);
 [A]WO8203008  (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al);
 [A]WO8707615  (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al);
 [A]WO9629340  (HAN SANG KEE [KR])
 [X]  - ARCHIVES OF ORAL BIOLOGY, Volume 36, No. 1, 1991, S. HIDAKA et al., "A New Method for the Study of the Formation and Transformation of Calcium Phosphate Precipitates: Effects of Several Chemical Agents and Chinese Folk Medicines", pages 49-54.,
 [X]  - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NUTRITION SOCIETY OF AUSTRALIA, 1995, E.C. REYNOLDS, "Dairy Products and Dental Health", pages 95-102.,
 [X]  - BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, Volume 1247, 1995, N. HUQ et al., "A 1H-NMR Study of the Casein Phosphopeptide alphas1-Casein (59-79)", pages 201-208.,
 [X]  - JOURNAL OF DENTAL RESEARCH, Volume 74, No. 6, 1995, E.C. REYNOLDS et al., "Anticariogenicity of Calcium Phosphate Complexes of Tryptic Casein Phosphopeptides in the Rat", pages 1272-1279.,
 [X]  - BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, Volume 314, No. 3, 1996, C. HOLT et al., "Ability of a beta-Casein Phosphopeptide to Modulate the Precipitation of Calcium Phosphate by Forming Amorphous Dicalcium Phosphate Nanoclusters", pages 1035-1039.,
 [X]  - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, Volume 646, 1993, E.C. REYNOLDS et al., "The Analysis of Multiple Phosphoseryl-Containing Casein Peptides Using Capillary Zone Electrophoresis", pages 391-396.,
 [X]  - ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, Volume 19, 1996, N.J. ADAMSON and E.C. REYNOLDS, "Characterization of Casein Phosphopeptides Prepared Using Alcalase: Determination of Enzyme Specificity", pages 202-207.,
 [XP]  - JOURNAL OF DENTAL RESEARCH, Volume 76, No. 9, 1997, E.C. REYNOLDS, "Remineralization of Enamel Subsurface Lesions by Casein Phosphopeptide-Stabilized Calcium Phosphate Solutions", pages 1587-1595.,
 [A]  - ARCHIVES OF ORAL BIOLOGY, Volume 39, No. 8, 1994, K. WILKIEL et al., "Hydroxyapatite Mineralization and Demineralization in the Presence of Synthetic Phosphorylated Pentapeptides", pages 715-721.,
Examination   CROSS K J ET AL, "Physiochemical characterization of casein phosphopeptide-amorphous calcium phosphate nanocomplexes", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC, US, (20050415), vol. 280, no. 15, doi:10.1074/JBC.M413504200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 15362 - 15369, XP003014124

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M413504200
    K. J. CROSS ET AL, "Casein Phosphopeptides in Oral Health - Chemistry and Clinical Applications", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN, (20070301), vol. 13, no. 8, doi:10.2174/138161207780363086, ISSN 1381-6128, pages 793 - 800, XP055022853

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/138161207780363086
    "pH device Combo", Catalogue, Conrad,
    Comparison of two models of complex according to the invention,
    CROSS K.J. ET AL., "Physicochemical characterization of casein phosphopeptide-amorphous calcium phosphate nanocomplexes", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20050415), vol. 280, no. 15, pages 15362 - 15369,
    CROSS K.J. ET AL., "Casein phosphopeptides in oral health - chemistry and clinical applications", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN, (2007), vol. 13, pages 793 - 800,
by applicantWO9303707
 WO9400146
    - REYNOLDS EC, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NUTRITION SOCIETY OF AUSTRALIA, (1995), pages 95 - 102,