Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977612

EP0977612 - APPLICATOR FOR SEMI-SOLID MEDICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.2003
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
J. URIACH & CIA. S.A.
Degà Bahi, 59-67
E-08026 Barcelona / ES
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / FERRER, Francisco
Casa B Mariné, 28
E-08190 Sant Cugat / ES
02 / IZQUIERDO, José, Ignacio
Cami Reial, 67, 3o-2a
E-08390 Montgat / ES
03 / FORN, Javier
Paseo de los Tilos, 25
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
04 / SEGADO, Javier
Avenida Icaria 176, 6o-2a
E-08005 Barcelona / ES
 [2001/33]
Former [2000/06]01 / FERRER, Francisco
Casa B Mariné, 28
E-08190 Sant Cugat / ES
02 / IZQUIERDO, José, Ignacio
Cami Reial, 67, 3o-2
E-08390 Montgat / ES
03 / FORN, Javier
Paseo de los Tilos, 25
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
04 / SEGADO, Javier
Avenida Icaria 176, 6o-2
E-08005 Barcelona / ES
Representative(s)Klingseisen, Franz , et al
Klingseisen, Rings & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Klingseisen, Franz , et al
Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
Former [2000/06]Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
Application number, filing date98908069.206.02.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998EP00674
Priority number, dateES1997000025207.02.1997         Original published format: ES 9700252
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9834671
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977612
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977612
Date:12.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61M31/00
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
Extension statesAL29.07.1999
LT29.07.1999
LV29.07.1999
MK29.07.1999
RO29.07.1999
SI29.07.1999
TitleGerman:APPLIKATOR FÜR HALBFESTE MEDIKAMENTE[2000/06]
English:APPLICATOR FOR SEMI-SOLID MEDICATIONS[2000/06]
French:APPLICATEUR POUR MEDICAMENTS SEMI-SOLIDES[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase29.07.1999National basic fee paid 
29.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
10.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2002Fee for grant paid
19.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DY]US4636202  (LOWIN DAVID A [US], et al) [DY] 1,2,4,7,10 * column 4, line 19 - column 7, line 58; figure - *;
 [DY]US2630804  (MENDE WILLIAM C) [DY] 1,2,4,7,10 * column W *;
 [DA]WO9321986  (SCHERING PLOUGH HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [DA] 3,4,6,11,12 * page 18, line 18 - page 19, line 4 * * abstract *
by applicantUS2630804
 US4636202
 WO9321986