Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973752

EP0973752 - HETEROCYCLICALLY SUBSTITUTED AROMATIC AMINO COMPOUNDS WITH A HERBICIDAL EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer CropScience AG
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Bayer CropScience AG
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50
40789 Monheim / DE
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ANDREE, Roland
Dechant-Miebach-Weg 37
D-40764 Langenfeld / DE
02 / DREWES, Mark, Wilhelm
Goethestrasse 38
D-40764 Langenfeld / DE
03 / FINDEISEN, Kurt
Dünfelder Strasse 28
D-51375 Leverkusen / DE
04 / KLUTH, Joachim
Virneburgstrasse 69
D-40764 Langenfeld / DE
05 / LINKER, Karl-Heinz
Kurt-Schumacher-Ring 56
D-51377 Leverkusen / DE
06 / MÜLLER, Klaus-Helmut
Solfstrasse 19
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
07 / SCHALLNER, Otto
Noldeweg 22
D-40789 Monheim / DE
08 / DOLLINGER, Markus
Burscheider Strasse 154b
D-51381 Leverkusen / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date98908103.920.02.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP00972
Priority number, dateDE199710892805.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19708928
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9839304
Date:11.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973752
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973752
Date:11.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D239/54, A01N43/54, C07D249/12, C07D249/16
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/04]
TitleGerman:HETEROZYKLISCH SUBSTITUIERTE AROMATISCHE AMINOVERBINDUNGEN MIT HERBIZIDER WIRKUNG[2000/04]
English:HETEROCYCLICALLY SUBSTITUTED AROMATIC AMINO COMPOUNDS WITH A HERBICIDAL EFFECT[2000/04]
French:COMPOSES AMINES AROMATIQUES SUBSTITUES A ACTION HERBICIDE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase05.10.1999National basic fee paid 
05.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
23.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2005Fee for grant paid
15.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
[2008/15]
Former [2006/22]NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
Former [2006/14]DK11.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
Former [2006/13]DK11.08.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH06345743  (SANKYO CO) [X] 1-3,6-9 * vgl. mit Z=Z23 *; column W *;
 [X]EP0011693  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * unter anderem Z=Z3,Z9,Z10,Z13 *; column W *;
 [X]WO9311097  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * Z = Z29, siehe Q=Q1 und Y,X unf R3 *; column W *;
 [X]WO9618618  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9 * insbesondere Formel I im Vergleich mit Z=Z13 *; column W *;
 [Y]US5136868  (THEODORIDIS GEORGE [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * Z = Z6, siehe Beispiele 202, 245, 277 *; column W *;
 [Y]US4906286  (LYGA JOHN W [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * Z=Z33, siehe Beispiele 92, 93 *; column W *;
 [Y]WO9607323  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * Z = Z3 *; column W *;
 [Y]EP0255047  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * Z = Z3 *; column W *;
 [Y]WO9404511  (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * Z = Z3 *; column W *;
 [Y]US5084084  (SATOW JUN [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * Z = Z3 *; column W *;
 [Y]US4249934  (JIKIHARA TETSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * Z = Z13 *; column W *;
 [Y]WO8703782  (FMC CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * Z = Z1, Z4 *; column W *;
 [Y]US4213773  (WOLF ANTHONY D [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * Z = Z1, Z4 *; column W *;
 [Y]WO9616043  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * Z = Z21 *; column W *;
 [Y]EP0558999  (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * Z =Z9 *; column W *;
 [Y]WO9705120  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * column W *;
 [YD]US5108486  (KONDO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [YD] 1-3,6-9 * column W *;
 [Y]WO9414817  (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * column W *;
 [X]US3922162  (KRENZER JOHN) [X] 4,5 * column W *