Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971681

EP0971681 - MEANS AND METHOD FOR DYING AND COLORING KERATIN FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hans Schwarzkopf GmbH & Co. KG
Hohenzollernring 127
22763 Hamburg / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / AKRAM, Mustafa
Zylberbergstrasse 14
D-22457 Hamburg / DE
02 / KLEEN, Astrid
Nordstrasse 17
D-40699 Erkrath / DE
03 / WOLFF, Wolfgang
Neue Strasse 36
D-22941 Bargteheide / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Foitzik, Joachim Kurt
Henkel KGaA TTP/Patentabteilung
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Foitzik, Joachim Kurt
Henkel KGaA TTP/Patentabteilung
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98908111.225.02.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998EP01062
Priority number, dateDE199710849703.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19708497
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9838976
Date:11.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971681
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971681
Date:02.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/13
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUM FÄRBEN UND TÖNEN KERATINISCHER FASERN[2000/03]
English:MEANS AND METHOD FOR DYING AND COLORING KERATIN FIBERS[2000/03]
French:PRODUIT ET PROCEDE POUR TEINTER ET COLORER DES FIBRES DE KERATINE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase25.08.1999National basic fee paid 
25.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
18.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2002Fee for grant paid
20.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI02.05.2003
FR02.05.2003
GB02.05.2003
IT02.05.2003
NL02.05.2003
DK02.08.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
ES13.08.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2006/14]FI02.05.2003
FR02.05.2003
GB02.05.2003
NL02.05.2003
DK02.08.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
ES13.08.2003
Former [2004/23]FI02.05.2003
GB02.05.2003
NL02.05.2003
DK02.08.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
ES13.08.2003
Former [2004/22]FI02.05.2003
GB02.05.2003
NL02.05.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
ES13.08.2003
Former [2004/05]FI02.05.2003
NL02.05.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
ES13.08.2003
Former [2004/03]NL02.05.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
ES13.08.2003
Former [2004/02]NL02.05.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE02.08.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]FR2290186  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,4,6-8,10,11 * examples 2,5,VIII,IX; claim - *;
 [X]FR2514258  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,11 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 16; claim - *;
 [DA]DE3247806  (OREAL [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2348911  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1 * example - *;
 [DA]DE3325790  (WELLA AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2540106  (SCHWARZKOPF GMBH HANS [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *