Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970430

EP0970430 - METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING AN ASSOCIATIVE MEMORY BASED ON A DIGITAL TRIE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.12.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Nokia Networks Oy
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / TIKKANEN, Matti
Viherlaaksonranta 10 A 1
FIN-02710 Espoo / FI
02 / IIVONEN, Jukka-Pekka
Wallininkatu 6 C 72
FIN-00530 Helsinki / FI
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka
Page White & Farrer
Runeberginkatu 5, 10th Fl
00100 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2002/42]Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka
Page White & Farrer Runeberginkatu 5, 10th Floor
00100 Helsinki / FI
Former [2002/20](deleted)
...
Former [2000/02]Honkanen, Jukka Samuli , et al
Patent Agency Compatent Ltd., Pitkänsillanranta 3 B
00530 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98908122.904.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998FI00191
Priority number, dateFI1997000106614.03.1997         Original published format: FI 971066
[2000/02]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841932
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970430
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search reportSE24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR EINRICHTUNG EINES ASSOZIATIVEN SPEICHERS AUF BASIS EINER DIGITALEN BAUMSTRUKTUR[2000/02]
English:METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING AN ASSOCIATIVE MEMORY BASED ON A DIGITAL TRIE STRUCTURE[2000/02]
French:MISE EN OEUVRE D'UNE MEMOIRE ASSOCIATIVE SUR LA BASE D'UNE STRUCTURE NUMERIQUE ARBORESCENTE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase14.06.1999Translation filed 
30.08.1999National basic fee paid 
30.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
30.08.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
27.11.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US5276868  (POOLE NIGEL T [US]);
 [X]JPH08194719  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [A]WO9534155  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al);
 [A]WO9600945  (IBM [US], et al);
 [A]EP0650131  (MICROSOFT CORP [US])