Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968221

EP0968221 - NOVEL SALICYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE IN COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.04.2004  [2004/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DALKO, Maria
16, Résidence du Château de Courcelles
F-91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR
02 / GALEY, Jean-Baptiste
12, rue Charles Dordain
F-93600 Aulnay sous Bois / FR
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Dodin, Catherine
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Dodin, Catherine
L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98908141.906.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998FR00231
Priority number, dateFR1997000161712.02.1997         Original published format: FR 9701617
[2000/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9835973
Date:20.08.1998
Language:FR
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968221
Date:05.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968221
Date:02.05.2003
Language:FR
[2003/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07H3/04, C07H13/04, C07H15/203, A61K7/48, A61K7/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:SALICYLSÄURE-DERIVATE UND IHRER VERWENDUNG IN KOSMETISCHE- ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2000/01]
English:NOVEL SALICYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE IN COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITIONS[2000/01]
French:NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE L'ACIDE SALICYLIQUE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LES COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES OU DERMATOLOGIQUES[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase13.09.1999National basic fee paid 
13.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
13.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2003Fee for grant paid
25.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0597776  (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPH08268872  ;
 [Y]JPH08268871  ;
 [Y]JPH08268870  ;
 [Y]JPH08268869  ;
 [Y]JPH08268868  ;
 [Y]JPH08268858  ;
 [A]JPS59152328  ;
 [DA]EP0649648  (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 097, no. 002, [Y] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841225), vol. 008, no. 283, Database accession no. (C - 258), [A] 1 * abstract *