Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977844

EP0977844 - MAMMAL NEURONAL ACID SENSING CATIONIC CHANNEL, CLONING AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2008
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS-
3, rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/48]For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris / FR
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / WALDMANN, Rainer
Chemin de Chense
F-83600 Les Adrets de l'Esterel / FR
02 / BASSILANA, Frédéric
15, rue Deville
F-06000 Nice / FR
03 / LAZDUNSKI, Michel
21, avenue Colombo
06000 Nice / FR
04 / CHAMPIGNY, Guy
décédé / FR
05 / HEURTEAUX, Catherine
Rés. Elvira Hills D1 1187, Route de Saint Jean
F-06600 Antibes / FR
06 / LINGUEGLIA, Eric
20, boulevard Dubouchage
F-06000 Nice / FR
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Breesé, Pierre
Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Breese, Pierre
Breese - Majerowicz 3, avenue de l'Opéra
75001 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98908176.511.02.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998FR00270
Priority number, dateFR1997000157411.02.1997         Original published format: FR 9701574
FR1997000958728.07.1997         Original published format: FR 9709587
[2000/06]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9835034
Date:13.08.1998
Language:FR
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977844
Date:09.02.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977844
Date:28.11.2007
Language:FR
[2007/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, A61K38/17, G01N33/68
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:SÄUREEMPFINDLICHER NEURONALER SÄUGETIERKATIONENKANAL, DESSEN KLONIERUNG UND ANWENDUNG[2007/29]
English:MAMMAL NEURONAL ACID SENSING CATIONIC CHANNEL, CLONING AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF[2000/06]
French:CANAL CATIONIQUE NEURONAL DE MAMMIFERE SENSIBLE A L'ACIDITE, SON CLONAGE ET SES APPLICATIONS[2000/06]
Former [2000/06]SÄUREEMPFINDLICHER NEURONALER SÄUGETIERKATIONKANAL, DESSEN KLONIERUNG UND ANWENDUNG
Entry into regional phase11.08.1999National basic fee paid 
11.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
08.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2007Fee for grant paid
15.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
26.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.09.1999FR   M01   Fee paid on   23.09.1999
23.09.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   23.09.1999
23.09.1999GR   M01   Fee paid on   23.09.1999
23.09.1999IE   M01   Fee paid on   23.09.1999
23.09.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   23.09.1999
23.09.1999LU   M01   Fee paid on   23.09.1999
23.09.1999MC   M01   Fee paid on   23.09.1999
23.09.1999NL   M01   Fee paid on   23.09.1999
23.09.1999PT   M01   Fee paid on   23.09.1999
23.09.1999SE   M01   Fee paid on   23.09.1999
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200003   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
IE28.11.2007
NL28.11.2007
LU11.02.2008
BE28.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
GR29.02.2008
PT28.04.2008
[2010/28]
Former [2009/13]AT28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
IE28.11.2007
NL28.11.2007
BE28.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
GR29.02.2008
PT28.04.2008
Former [2008/48]AT28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
IE28.11.2007
NL28.11.2007
MC28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
PT28.04.2008
Former [2008/46]AT28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
NL28.11.2007
MC28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
PT28.04.2008
Former [2008/42]AT28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
NL28.11.2007
SE28.02.2008
PT28.04.2008
Former [2008/35]AT28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
NL28.11.2007
SE28.02.2008
Former [2008/29]AT28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
NL28.11.2007
SE28.02.2008
Former [2008/25]FI28.11.2007
NL28.11.2007
SE28.02.2008
Former [2008/23]NL28.11.2007
SE28.02.2008
Cited inInternational search[DXY]  - WALDMANN R ET AL, "THE MAMMALIAN DEGENERIN MDEG, AN AMILORIDE-SENSITIVE CATION CHANNEL ACTIVED BY MUTATIONS CAUSING NEURODEGENERATION IN CAENORHABDITIS ELEGANS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19960503), vol. 271, no. 18, pages 10433 - 10436, XP002051361 [DX] 1,4,11,14,17-22 * the whole document * [Y] 23,25

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.18.10433
 [X]  - COREY D P ET AL, "MECHANOSENSATION AND THE DEG/ENAC ION CHANNELS", SCIENCE, (19960719), vol. 273, no. 5273, page 323/324, XP002051360 [X] 1,3,11,13,17-22,24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.273.5273.323
 [Y]  - GILBERTSON, TIMOTHY A. ET AL, "Proton currents through amiloride-sensitive sodium channels in isolated hamster taste cells: Enhancement by vasopressin and cAMP", NEURON (1993), 10(5), 931-42 CODEN: NERNET;ISSN: 0896-6273, XP002068540 [Y] 1,10,11,17-25 * page 938 - page 939 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0896-6273(93)90208-9
 [Y]  - PRICE MP ET AL, "Cloning and expression of a novel human brain Na+ channel.", J BIOL CHEM, APR 5 1996, 271 (14) P7879-82, UNITED STATES, XP002068541 [Y] 1,10,11,17-22,24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.14.7879
 [AD]  - EMBL databank Accession number w62694 09-JUN-1996 Marra M et al., XP002068546 [AD] 1,11,17-22,24 * the whole document *
 [A]  - AKAIKE N ET AL, "Proton-induced current in neuronal cells.", PROG NEUROBIOL, MAY 1994, 43 (1) P73-83, ENGLAND, XP002068567 [A] 1,2,10-12,17-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0301-0082(94)90016-7
 [PX]  - WALDMANN R ET AL, "A proton-gated cation channel involved in acid-sensing.", NATURE, MAR 13 1997, 386 (6621) P173-7, ENGLAND, XP002068589 [PX] 1,2,10-12,17-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/386173a0
 [PX]  - BASSILANA F ET AL, "The acid-sensitive ionic channel subunit ASIC and the mammalian degenerin MDEG form a heteromultimeric H+-gated Na+ channel with novel properties.", J BIOL CHEM, NOV 14 1997, 272 (46) P28819-22, UNITED STATES, XP002068543 [PX] 1,2,10-12,17-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.46.28819
 [PX]  - LINGUEGLIA E ET AL, "A modulatory subunit of acid sensing ion channels in brain and dorsal root ganglion cells.", J BIOL CHEM, NOV 21 1997, 272 (47) P29778-83, XP002068544 [PX] 1,2,10-12,17-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.47.29778
 [PX]  - BARBRY P ET AL, "Molecular biology of Na+ absorption.", AM J PHYSIOL, SEP 1997, 273 (3 PT 1) PG571-85, UNITED STATES, XP002068545 [PX] 1,2,4,10-12,14,17-25 * page 573, column R, paragraph 2 - page 576, column L, paragraph 2 *
 [PX]  - GARCIA-ANOVEROS J ET AL, "BNAC1 AND BNAC2 CONSTITUTE A NEW FAMILY OF HUMAN NEURONAL SODIUM CHANNELS RELATED TO DEGENERINS AND EPITHELIAL SODIUM CHANNELS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (19970218), vol. 94, no. 4, pages 1459 - 1464, XP002051359 [PX] 1,3,4,11,13,14,17-22,25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.4.1459