Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967979

EP0967979 - THE USE OF LEVOBUPIVACAINE OR ROPIVACAINE IN TREATING MIGRAINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.04.2004  [2004/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Darwin Discovery Limited
208 Bath Road Slough
Berks SL1 3WE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/05]For all designated states
Darwin Discovery Limited
208 Bath Road
Slough Berks SL1 3WE / GB
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Darwin Discovery Limited
Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB
Inventor(s)01 / EVETTS, Ian Ashley, Darwin Discovery Limited
Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB
02 / GUNNING, Simon John, Darwin Discovery Limited
Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Perry, Robert Edward
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Perry, Robert Edward
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98908228.403.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998GB00662
Priority number, dateGB1997000434903.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9704349
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9838998
Date:11.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967979
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/445
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON LEVOBUPIVACAINE ODER ROPIVACAINE IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON MIGRÄNE[2000/01]
English:THE USE OF LEVOBUPIVACAINE OR ROPIVACAINE IN TREATING MIGRAINE[2000/01]
French:UTILISATION DE LA LEVOBUPIVACAINE OU DE LA ROPIVACAINE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MIGRAINE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase13.09.1999National basic fee paid 
13.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
07.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/17]
18.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/17]
Request for further processing for:13.01.2003Request for further processing filed
10.01.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.02.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9510276  (CHIROSCIENCE LTD ;BARDSLEY HAZEL JUDITH (GB); MATHER LAURENCE (AU)) [Y] 1 * page 3, lines 21-23; claims 1,4 *;
 [PX]GB2315673  (MERCK & CO INC) [PX] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - GRISTWOOD R ET AL, "REDUCED CARDIOTOXICITY OF LEVOBUPIVACAINE COMPARED WITH RACEMIC BUPIVACAINE (MARCAINE): NEW CLINICAL EVIDENCE", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (199411), vol. 3, no. 11, pages 1209 - 1212, XP000610836 [Y] 1 * page 1211, column R, paragraph L *
 [DY]  - M.BARTH ET AL, "EFFECTS OF APPLICATION OF I.V. WITH LOAL ANAESTHESIA ON CHRONIC PAIN SYNDROMES, ESPECIALLY HEADACHE AND MIGRAINE", PAIN, AMSTERDAM, THE NETHERLANDS, (1984), page S269, XP002068058 [DY] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(84)90536-0