Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977915

EP0977915 - METHOD FOR MAKING A STABLE WEB HAVING ENHANCED EXTENSIBILITY IN MULTIPLE DIRECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.2002
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BENSON, Douglas, Herrin
206 Jamison Road
West Harrison, IN 47060 / US
02 / CURRO, John, Joseph
3102 Dot Drive
Cincinnati, OH 45213 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Hirsch, Uwe Thomas , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date98908241.730.03.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998IB00460
Priority number, dateUS1997084151423.04.1997         Original published format: US 841514
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848091
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977915
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977915
Date:24.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/54, D04H13/00, B32B5/04
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER STABILEN BAHN MIT ERHÖHTER DEHNBARKEIT IN JEDE RICHTUNG[2000/06]
English:METHOD FOR MAKING A STABLE WEB HAVING ENHANCED EXTENSIBILITY IN MULTIPLE DIRECTIONS[2000/06]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN VOILE STABLE PRESENTANT UNE EXTENSIBILITE AMELIOREE DANS DES DIRECTIONS MULTIPLES[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
22.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2001Fee for grant paid
19.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.10.2001
CH24.10.2001
FI24.10.2001
LI24.10.2001
DK24.01.2002
PT24.01.2002
GR25.01.2002
LU30.03.2002
IE01.04.2002
[2005/01]
Former [2004/39]AT24.10.2001
CH24.10.2001
FI24.10.2001
LI24.10.2001
DK24.01.2002
PT24.01.2002
LU30.03.2002
IE01.04.2002
Former [2003/46]AT24.10.2001
CH24.10.2001
FI24.10.2001
LI24.10.2001
DK24.01.2002
PT24.01.2002
IE01.04.2002
Former [2003/29]AT24.10.2001
CH24.10.2001
FI24.10.2001
LI24.10.2001
PT24.01.2002
IE01.04.2002
Former [2003/09]AT24.10.2001
CH24.10.2001
FI24.10.2001
LI24.10.2001
PT24.01.2002
Former [2003/01]CH24.10.2001
FI24.10.2001
LI24.10.2001
PT24.01.2002
Former [2002/48]FI24.10.2001
PT24.01.2002
Former [2002/33]FI24.10.2001
Cited inInternational search[PA]WO9805813  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [PA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5226992  (MORMAN MICHAEL T) [DA] 1,8 * figure - *;
 [A]US4965122  (MORMAN MICHAEL T) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0432755  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO) [A] 1,8 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4422892  (PLANT DEREK) [A] 1 * figure 1 *