Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972033

EP0972033 - MODULATORS OF THE FUNCTION OF RECEPTORS OF THE TNF/NGF RECEPTOR FAMILY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  23.11.2007
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD.
The Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95
76100 Rehovot / IL
[2007/44]
Former [2007/43]For all designated states
YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMEMT CO., LTD.
The Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95
76100 Rehovot / IL
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd.
Weizman Institute of Science, P.O. Box 95
76100 Rehovot / IL
Inventor(s)01 / WALLACH, David
Borochov Street 24
76406 Rehovot / IL
02 / KOVALENKO, Andrei
Beit Clore Weizmann Institute of Science
76100 Rehovot / IL
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/03]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98908273.019.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998IL00125
Priority number, dateIL1997012048519.03.1997         Original published format: IL 12048597
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841624
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972033
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12N15/70, C12N15/86, C12N5/10, C12N1/21, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50, A61K38/17, A61K31/70
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
Extension statesAL15.10.1999
LT15.10.1999
LV15.10.1999
MK15.10.1999
RO15.10.1999
SI15.10.1999
TitleGerman:MODULATOREN DER FUNKTION VON REZEPTOREN DER TNF/NGF FAMILIE[2000/03]
English:MODULATORS OF THE FUNCTION OF RECEPTORS OF THE TNF/NGF RECEPTOR FAMILY[2000/03]
French:MODULATEURS DE LA FONCTION DE RECEPTEURS DE LA FAMILLE DES RECEPTEURS DES FACTEURS TNF OU NGF[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase15.10.1999National basic fee paid 
15.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
22.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.04.2007Date of oral proceedings
24.05.2007Date of oral proceedings
13.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/52]
13.08.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.08.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/52]
Request for further processing for:29.07.2005Request for further processing filed
29.07.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.08.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9625941  (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [X] 21 * abstract * * examples 1-6 * * claims 1-36 * [Y] 12,15-20,23-25;
 [XDA]  - MALININ N.L. ET AL., "MAP3K-related kinase involved in NF-kB induction by TN, CD95 and IL-1", NATURE, (19970206), vol. 385, pages 540 - 544, XP002072213 [XD] 13,14,22,26-28 * figure 1 * [A] 1-12,15-21,23-25

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/385540a0
 [XY]  - DUAN H. & DIXIT V.M., "RAIDD is a new 'death' adaptor molecule", NATURE, (19970102), vol. 385, pages 86 - 89, XP002072214 [X] 1,2,5-9,11,13,14,22,26,28 * the whole document * [Y] 12,15-20,23-25

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/385086a0
 [X]  - AHMAD M. ET AL., "CRADD, a novel human apoptotic adaptor molecule for Caspase-2 and FasL/TNFR-interacting protein RIP", CANCER RES., (19970215), vol. 57, pages 615 - 619, XP002072215 [X] 1,2,5-9,11,13,14,22,26,28 * the whole document *
 [XD]  - HSU H ET AL, "THE TNF RECEPTOR 1-ASSOCIATED PROTEIN TRADD SIGNALS CELL DEATH AND NF-KAPPA B ACTIVATION", CELL, (19950519), vol. 81, no. 4, pages 495 - 504, XP002015438 [XD] 1,2,5-9,11-14,22,26-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(95)90070-5
 [XD]  - CHINNAIYAN A M ET AL, "FADD, A NOVEL DEATH DOMAIN-CONTAINING PROTEIN, INTERACTS WITH THE DEATH DOMAIN OF FAS AND INITIATED APOPTOSIS", CELL, (19950519), vol. 81, pages 505 - 512, XP002037498 [XD] 1,2,5-9,11,13,14,22,26-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(95)90071-3
 [DA]  - STANGER B.Z., "RIP: A novel protein containing a death domain that interacts with Fas/APO-1 (CD95) in yeast and causes cell death", CELL, (199505), vol. 81, pages 513 - 523, XP002072216 [DA] 1-28

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(95)90072-1