Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980634

EP0980634 - AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR THE FUNCTIONAL DOUBLING WITH MULTIPLE CARDS OF CELLULAR TELEPHONES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/08]AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR THE FUNCTIONAL DOUBLING WITH MULTIPLE CARDS OF CELLULAR TELEPHONES AND SIMILAR
[2005/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ferrara, Giovanni
Via Taranto, 36
85025 Melfi / IT
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Mascioli, Alessandro
Via Leonina, 26
00184 Roma / IT
[2000/37]
Former [2000/08]Mascioli, Alessandro, Prof.Dr. , et al
c/o A.N.D.I. Associazione Nazionale degli Inventori Via Urbana, 20
00184 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date98908279.706.03.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998IT00048
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9945730
Date:10.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980634
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980634
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/32
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR FUNKTIONELLEN VERDOPPELUNG ZELLULARER TELEFONE MIT EINER VIELZAHL VON KARTEN[2005/11]
English:AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR THE FUNCTIONAL DOUBLING WITH MULTIPLE CARDS OF CELLULAR TELEPHONES[2005/11]
French:DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE PERMETTANT UN DEDOUBLEMENT FONCTIONNEL DE TELEPHONES CELLULAIRES PAR CARTES MULTIPLES[2005/11]
Former [2000/08]ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR FUNKTIONELLEN VERDOPPELUNG ZELLULARER TELEFONE UND DERGLEICHEN MIT EINER VIELZAHL VON KARTEN
Former [2000/08]AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR THE FUNCTIONAL DOUBLING WITH MULTIPLE CARDS OF CELLULAR TELEPHONES AND SIMILAR
Former [2000/08]DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE PERMETTANT UN DEDOUBLEMENT FONCTIONNEL DE TELEPHONES CELLULAIRES ET ANALOGUE PAR CARTES MULTIPLES
Entry into regional phase24.11.1999National basic fee paid 
24.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
01.08.2001Observations by third parties
24.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2005Fee for grant paid
11.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
18.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200508   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
DK14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
[2006/35]
Former [2006/25]BE14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
SE14.12.2005
Former [2006/22]FI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
SE14.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI14.09.2005
SE14.12.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0556970  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 32 - line 51 * * column 3, line 20 - line 49; figure . *;
 [A]GB2269512  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES UK [GB], et al) [A] 1,10 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 4; figure . * * page 5, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]DE4302820  (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 32; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5657373  (HERMANSSON JAN [SE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9705729  (TELECOM ITALIA MOBILE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,5 * page 2, line 16 - page 4, line 24 *;
 [A]JPH0918965  ;
 [A]US5420914  (BLUMHARDT MARK S [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 097, no. 005, & JP09018965 A 19970117 (DAINI DENDEN KK) [A] 1,2,8,9 * abstract *
ExaminationWO9726719
otherWO9726719