Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975290

EP0975290 - GARMENT OR SANITARY PROTECTION MADE OF AN ELASTIC FABRIC DIRECTLY ENGAGEABLE BY "VELCRO"$m(3) FASTENERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.10.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.12.2004  [2004/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pavis Varese S.R.L.
Via Rossini, 11/B
21020 Buguggiate / IT
[2004/01]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Pavis Varese S.R.L.
Via Robbioni 39
21100 Varese / IT
Inventor(s)01 / FRANGI, Giampietro
Via Conte Biancamano, 43
I-21100 Varese / IT
02 / FRANGI, Gianluigi
Via Conte Biancamano, 51
I-21100 Varese / IT
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Pellegri, Alberto , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Pellegri, Alberto , et al
c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza Repubblica, 5
21100 Varese / IT
Application number, filing date98908285.417.03.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998IT00054
Priority number, dateIT1997VA0001216.04.1997         Original published format: IT VA970012
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846175
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975290
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search reportEP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/01, A61F5/02
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/05]
TitleGerman:AUS EINEM ELASTISCHEN GEWEBE HERGESTELLTES KLEIDUNGS- ODER SANITÄRSCHUTZPRODUKT, WELCHES DIREKT MIT HAFTVERSCHLÜSSEN VERBUNDEN WERDEN KANN[2000/05]
English:GARMENT OR SANITARY PROTECTION MADE OF AN ELASTIC FABRIC DIRECTLY ENGAGEABLE BY "VELCRO"$m(3) FASTENERS[2000/05]
French:VETEMENT OU PROTECTION CORPORELLE EN TISSU ELASTIQUE POUVANT ETRE DIRECTEMENT ATTACHE A L'AIDE DE FIXATIONS DU TYPE "VELCRO"$m(3)[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase02.08.1999National basic fee paid 
02.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
06.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/51]
12.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5139479  (PETERS HELENA [SE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 26 - line 41 *;
 [X]US5036939  (JOHNSON MITCHELL [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 20; figure - *;
 [A]US5382466  (INGHAM PHILIP [GB]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5160314  (PETERS HELENA [SE]);
 [A]US5472413  (DETTY MICHAEL K [US]);
 [A]WO9219201  (CAMP INT INC [US]);
 [A]GB2089850  (KENDALL & CO)