Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970064

EP0970064 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF BENZOTHIAZOLONE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.09.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.11.2002  [2002/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2000/35]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
AstraZeneca UK Limited
15 Stanhope Gate
London W1Y 6LN / GB
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Astra Pharmaceuticals Limited
Home Park
Kings Langley, Herts WD4 8DH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / GOODWIN, Christopher
2 Chambers Close,Markfield
Leicestershire LE67 9NB / GB
[2000/02]
Representative(s)As Sivborg, Susanne Birgitta , et al
Astra AB, Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]As Sivborg, Susanne Birgitta , et al
Astra AB, Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
Application number, filing date98908361.317.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998SE00274
Priority number, dateSE1997000070627.02.1997         Original published format: SE 9700706
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9838180
Date:03.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970064
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE03.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D277/68, C07D277/62, C07D277/82, C07C335/16, C07C233/36, C07C233/18
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesLT27.09.1999
LV27.09.1999
MK27.09.1999
RO27.09.1999
SI27.09.1999
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BENZOTHIAZOLON-VERBINDUNGEN[2000/02]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF BENZOTHIAZOLONE COMPOUNDS[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSES DE BENZOTHIAZOLONE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999National basic fee paid 
27.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
06.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/46]
12.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0622362  ;
 [X]DE2631163  ;
 [X]DE3522941  ;
 [X]FR2298548  ;
 [X]EP0529600  ;
 [X]EP0102055  ;
 [A]DE3507824  ;
 [A]US3832365
 [X]  - JOSEPH WEINSTOCK et al., "Synthesis and Evaluation of Non-Catechol D-1 and D-2 Domapine Receptor Agonists: Benzimidazol-2-one, Benzoxazol-2-one and the Highly Potent Benzothiazol-2-one 7-Ethylamines", J. MED. CHEM., Volume 30, 1987, pages 1166-1176.
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 59, No. 5, 2 Sept. 1963, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), SHUNICHI YAMADA et al., "Preparation of Tyrosol and 4-Methoxyphenethyl Alcohol", page 1963, Abstract No. 5049; & CHEM. PHARM. BULL., 1963, 11, 258-260.