Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975452

EP0975452 - DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING OF TWO STRANDS IN PARALLEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.07.2003  [2003/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB AB
721 83 Västerås / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
ABB AB
721 83 Västeras / SE
Inventor(s)01 / HALLEFÄLT, Magnus
Svarvargatan 8A
S-723 37 Västeras / SE
02 / SVAHN, Conny
Gotgatan 17B
S-724 62 Västeras / SE
03 / SVENSSON, Erik
Bellmansgatan 7A
S-722 22 Västeras / SE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Franks, Barry Gerard , et al
BRANN AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Franks, Barry , et al
Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, Box 1344
751 43 Uppsala / SE
Application number, filing date98908416.506.03.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998SE00404
Priority number, dateSE1997000145718.04.1997         Original published format: SE 9701457
[2000/05]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847647
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975452
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B22D11/10
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM STRANGGIESSEN ZWEI PARALLELER STRÄNGE[2002/27]
English:DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING OF TWO STRANDS IN PARALLEL[2000/05]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COULAGE CONTINU DE DEUX LIGNES PARALLELES[2000/05]
Former [2000/05]VERFAHREN ZUM STRANGGIESSEN ZWEI PARALLELER STRÄNGE
Entry into regional phase29.10.1998Translation filed 
25.09.1999National basic fee paid 
25.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
25.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
06.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/31]
03.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0265796  (ASEA AB [SE]);
 [A]EP0577831  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al)