Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968295

EP0968295 - VECTORS HAVING ENHANCED EXPRESSION AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2009
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Connaught Technology Corporation
3711 Kenneth Pike, Suite 200
Greenville, DE 19807 / US
For all designated states
Arizona State University
P.O. Box 872701
Tempe, AZ 85287-2701 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/19]For all designated states
Connaught Technology Corporation
3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 200
Greenville, DE 19807 / US
For all designated states
Arizona State University
P.O. Box 872701
Tempe, AZ 85287-2701 / US
Former [2007/51]For all designated states
VIROGENETICS CORPORATION
465 Jordan Road Rensselaer Technology Park
Troy, NY 12180 / US
For all designated states
Arizona State University
P.O. Box 872701
Tempe, AZ 85287-2701 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
VIROGENETICS CORPORATION
465 Rensselaer Technology Park
Troy, NY 12180 / US
For all designated states
Arizona State University
P.O. Box 872701
Tempe, AZ 85287-2701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TARTAGLIA, James
7 Christina Drive
Schenectady, NY 12303 / US
02 / JACOBS, Bertram, L. Dep.of Microbiology, Arizona State Uni.
P.O. Box 87201
Tempe, Arizona 85287-2701 / US
03 / GOEBEL, Scott, J.
19 Glade Mallow Road
Ballston Spa, NY 12020 / US
04 / COX, William, I.
1379 Maple Trail
Sand Lake, NY 12153 / US
05 / GETTIG, Russell, Robert
R.D. 2, Box 421C
Averill Park, NY 12018 / US
06 / PINCUS, Steven, E.
78 Troy Road
East Greenbush, NY 12061 / US
07 / PAOLETTI, Enzo
297 Murray Avenue
Delmar, NY 12054 / US
 [2007/51]
Former [2000/37]01 / TARTAGLIA, James
7 Christina Drive
Schenectady, NY 12303 / US
02 / JACOBS, Bertram, L.
Dep.of Microbiology. Arizona St. Univ.P.O.Box87201
Tempe, Arizona 85287-2701 / US
03 / GOEBEL, Scott, J.
19 Glade Mallow Road
Ballston Spa, NY 12020 / US
04 / COX, William, I.
1379 Maple Trail
Sand Lake, NY 12153 / US
05 / GETTIG, Russell, Robert
R.D. 2, Box 421C
Averill Park, NY 12018 / US
06 / PINCUS, Steven, E.
78 Troy Road
East Greenbush, NY 12061 / US
07 / PAOLETTI, Enzo
297 Murray Avenue
Delmar, NY 12054 / US
Former [2000/01]01 / TARTAGLIA, James
7 Christina Drive
Schenectady, NY 12303 / US
02 / JACOBS, Bertram, L.
522 West Lynwood Street
Phoenix, AZ 85003 / US
03 / GOEBEL, Scott, J.
19 Glade Mallow Road
Ballston Spa, NY 12020 / US
04 / COX, William, I.
1379 Maple Trail
Sand Lake, NY 12153 / US
05 / GETTIG, Russell, Robert
R.D. 2, Box 421C
Averill Park, NY 12018 / US
06 / PINCUS, Steven, E.
78 Troy Road
East Greenbush, NY 12061 / US
07 / PAOLETTI, Enzo
297 Murray Avenue
Delmar, NY 12054 / US
Representative(s)Cole, William Gwyn , et al
Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 J J Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/42]Cole, William Gwyn , et al
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2006/29]Lawrence, Malcolm Graham , et al
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2000/01]Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98908723.425.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US03710
Priority number, dateUS1997081580912.03.1997         Original published format: US 815809
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840500
Date:17.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968295
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968295
Date:28.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/63, A61K39/12, A61K39/285, C12N15/86, C12N15/67
[2002/22]
Former International [2000/01]C12N15/63, A61K39/12, A61K39/285
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VEKTOREN MIT ERHÖHTER EXPRESSION, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN[2000/01]
English:VECTORS HAVING ENHANCED EXPRESSION AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USES THEREOF[2000/01]
French:VECTEURS PRESENTANT UNE EXPRESSION AMELIOREE, PROCEDES DE REALISATION ET UTILISATIONS DESDITS VECTEURS[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase01.10.1999National basic fee paid 
01.10.1999Search fee paid 
01.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
04.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.10.2007
10.09.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.10.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
27.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2008Fee for grant paid
31.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19]
Request for further processing for:30.06.2004Request for further processing filed
30.06.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.07.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI28.05.2008
SE28.08.2008
GR29.08.2008
PT28.10.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2009/12]FI28.05.2008
SE28.08.2008
PT28.10.2008
Former [2009/07]FI28.05.2008
SE28.08.2008
Former [2008/49]FI28.05.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]  GIANTINI M ET AL, "STIMULATION OF CHLORAMPHENICOL ACETYLTRANSFERASE MESSENGER RNA TRANSLATION BY REOVIRUS CAPSID POLYPEPTIDE SIGMA-3 IN COTRANSFECTED COS CELLS", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 63, no. 6, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 2415 - 2421, XP002194770 [X] 1-7,11-13,16,17 * the whole document *
 [X]  DAVIES M V ET AL, "THE VACCINIA VIRUS K3L GENE PRODUCT POTENTIATES TRANSLATION BY INHIBITING DOUBLE-STRANDED-RNA-ACTIVATED PROTEIN KINASE AND PHOSPHORYLATION OF THE ALPHA SUBUNIT OF EUKARYOTIC INITIATION FACTOR 2", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 66, no. 4, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1943 - 1950, XP002194772 [X] 1-7,11-13,16,17 * the whole document *
 [X]  SAMUEL CHARLES E, "Role of the RNA-dependent protein kinase in the regulated expression of genes in transfected cells.", PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, (1992), vol. 54, no. 3, ISSN 0163-7258, pages 307 - 317, XP002195051 [X] 1-8,11-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0163-7258(92)90005-K
International search[Y]US5494807  (PAOLETTI ENZO [US], et al);
 [Y]  - BEATTIE E., ET AL., "REVERSAL OF THE INTEFERON-SENSTITIVE PHENOTYPE OF A VACCINIA VIRUS LACKING E3L BY EXPRESSION OF THE REOVIRUS S4 GENE.", Genome Research, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory Press, (19950101), vol. 69., no. 01., ISSN 1088-9051, pages 499 - 505., XP002911126
 [Y]  - BEATTIE E., PAOLETTI E., TARTAGLIA J., "DISTINCT PATTERNS OF IFN SENSITIVITY OBSERVED IN CELLS INFECTED WITH VACCINIA K3L - AND E3L - MUTANT VIRUSES.", Virology, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950101), vol. 210., doi:10.1006/viro.1995.1342, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 254 - 263., XP002911127

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1995.1342
 [Y]  - MATHEWS M. B., SHENK T., "ADENOVIRUS VIRUS-ASSOCIATED RNA AND TRANSLATION CONTROL.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY., US, US, (19911101), vol. 65., no. 11., ISSN 0022-538X, pages 5657 - 5662., XP002911128
 [Y]  - SHARP T. V., ET AL., "COMPARATIVE ANALYSIS OF THE REGULATION OF THE INTERFERON-INDUCIBLE PROTEIN KINASE PKR BY EPSTEIN - BARR VIRUS RNAS EBER-1 AND EBER-2 AND ADENOVIRUS VA RNA.", Nucleic Acids Research, Information Retrieval Ltd., GB, GB, (19930101), vol. 21., no. 19., ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4483 - 4490., XP002911129
 [Y]  - PARK H., ET AL., "TAR RNA-BINDING PROTEIN IS AN INHIBITOR OF THE INTERFERON-INDUCED PROTEIN KINASE PKR.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19940501), vol. 91., doi:10.1073/pnas.91.11.4713, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4713 - 4717., XP002911130

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.11.4713
Examination   KAUFMAN, RANDAL J., "Identification of the components necessary for adenovirus translational control and their utilization in cDNA expression vectors", PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI., USA, (198502), vol. 82, pages 689 - 693,
    KAUFMAN RANDAL J. ET AL., "The Phosphorylation State of Eucaryotic Initiation Factor 2 Alters Translational Efficiency of Specific mRNAs", MOL. CELL. BIOL., (198903), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 946 - 958,