Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978146

EP0978146 - COLUMNAR-GRAINED POLYCRYSTALLINE SOLAR CELL SUBSTRATE AND IMPROVED METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Astropower, Inc.
Solar Park
Newark, DE 19716 / US
For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
SP FR 02 12
Corning NY 14831 / US
[2008/38]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Astropower, Inc.
Solar Park
Newark, DE 19716 / US
For all designated states
CORNING INCORPORATED
Sullivan Park FR 02 12
Corning New York 14831 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HALL, Robert, B.
807 Rock Lane
Newark, DE 19713 / US
02 / BARNETT, Allen, M.
2 Polaris Drive
Newark, DE 19711 / US
03 / COLLINS, Sandra, R.
801 N. St. Augustine Road
Chesapeake City, MD 21915 / US
04 / CHECCHI, Joseph, C.
1 Teakwood Drive
Newark, DE 19702 / US
05 / FORD, David, H.
210 Washington Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
06 / KENDALL, Christopher, L.
16 Tall Oaks Drive
Hockessin, DE 19707 / US
07 / RAND, James, A.
209 Evergreen Court
Landenberg, PA 19350 / US
08 / MOORE, Chad, B.
7 West 4th Street
Corning, NY 14830 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/06]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98908812.502.03.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US03972
Priority number, dateUS1997003941804.03.1997         Original published format: US 39418
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9839804
Date:11.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978146
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/20, H01L31/18, H01L31/036, H01L21/322
[2000/32]
Former International [2000/06]H01L31/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [2000/06]
TitleGerman:POLYKRISTALLINES SOLARZELLENSUBSTRAT MIT SÄULENFÖRMIGEN KÖRNERN UND VERBESSERTES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2000/06]
English:COLUMNAR-GRAINED POLYCRYSTALLINE SOLAR CELL SUBSTRATE AND IMPROVED METHOD OF MANUFACTURE[2000/06]
French:SUBSTRAT POLYCRISTALLIN A GRAIN COLUMNAIRE POUR CELLULE PHOTOVOLTAIQUE ET PERFECTIONNEMENT DU PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase06.09.1999National basic fee paid 
08.10.1999Search fee paid 
06.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
11.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/15]
05.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.11.1999M01   Fee paid on   25.11.1999
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200003   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2000
31.03.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5380372  (CAMPE HILMAR V [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 29 - column 7, line 4; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0341017  (ASTROSYST INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, lines 58-60 *;
 [A]US5486237  (SANO KEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 67; figures 1-6,12 *
International search[X]US5496416  (HALL ROBERT B [US], et al);
 [X]US5336335  (HALL ROBERT B [US], et al);
 [Y]US5279686  (NISHIDA SHOJI [JP]);
 [Y]US4087571  (KAMINS THEODORE I, et al)