Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971800

EP0971800 - METHOD OF IRRADIATION OF POLYMER FILMS BY AN ELECTRON BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.08.2002  [2002/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biosterile Technology Inc.
4104 Merchant Road
Fort Wayne, IN 46818 / US
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / IVANOVICH, Batskikh Gennady
Apartment 80,14 Khimkinsky Boulevard
Moscow, 123364 / RU
02 / ALEXANDROVICH, Vinogradov German
Apartment 15,12-1 Syrenevy Boulevard
Moscow, 105425 / RU
03 / VLADIMIROVICH, Denisjuck Sergei
Apartment 84,53 Projezd Shakaloskogo
Moscow, 121221 / RU
04 / IVANOVICH, Klionov Gennady
Apartment 60,3 Petrovsko-Rasumovsky pr.
Moscow, 125083 / RU
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date98908975.005.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US04324
Priority number, dateRU1997010401624.03.1997         Original published format: RU 97104016
US1997098726609.12.1997         Original published format: US 987266
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842453
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971800
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:B05D3/06, B29C71/04
[2001/34]
Former International [2000/03]B05D3/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BESTRAHLEN VON POLYMERFILMEN MIT EINEM ELEKTRONENSTRAHL[2000/03]
English:METHOD OF IRRADIATION OF POLYMER FILMS BY AN ELECTRON BEAM[2000/03]
French:PROCEDE D'IRRADIATION DE FILMS POLYMERES PAR UN FAISCEAU D'ELECTRONS[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase18.10.1999National basic fee paid 
18.10.1999Search fee paid 
18.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
18.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/33]
13.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2858442  (DEWEY II, D. R.) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 19 * * column 4, line 12 - column 4, line 30; figure 2 *;
 [X]GB805819  (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure 2; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]GB805818  (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure 1; claim 1 *
International search[X]US4642244