blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0967940

EP0967940 - PHYSIOLOGIC MITRAL VALVE IMPLANTATION HOLDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-3576 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GROSS, Jeffrey, M.
36 Via Tronido
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US
02 / SHU, Mark, C., S.
57 Melrose Drive
Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US
03 / SALAZAR, Luis, A.
15041 Avenida De Las Flores
Chino Hills, CA 91709 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date98909009.726.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US04433
Priority number, dateUS1997080855328.02.1997         Original published format: US 808553
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9837837
Date:03.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967940
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0967940
Date:03.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61F2/24
[2000/01]
CPC:
A61F2/2427 (EP,US); A61F2/2457 (EP,US); A61F2250/0097 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/01]
TitleGerman:HALTERUNG FÜR EINE PHYSIOLOGISCHE MITRALKLAPPENPROTHESE[2004/17]
English:PHYSIOLOGIC MITRAL VALVE IMPLANTATION HOLDING SYSTEM[2000/01]
French:SYSTEME DE MAINTIEN D'IMPLANTATION DE VALVULE MITRALE PHYSIOLOGIQUE[2000/01]
Former [2000/01]HALTERUNG ZUM FESTHALTEN EINER PHYSIOLOGISCHEN MITRALKLAPPENPROTHESE
Entry into regional phase21.09.1999National basic fee paid 
21.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2002/46]
14.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2004Fee for grant paid
19.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH03.11.2004
IT03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
ES14.02.2005
[2008/15]
Former [2005/27]CH03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
ES14.02.2005
Former [2005/25]CH03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]US4865600  (CARPENTIER ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5089015  (ROSS DONALD N [GB]) [A] 1* abstract *;
 [A]WO9418909  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9530386  (AUTOGENICS [US]) [A] 1 * claim 7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.