Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015334

EP1015334 - STACKABLE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Triangle Container Corporation
Erie Avenue and E. Street
Philadelphia, PA 19134 / US
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / SHEFFER, Phil, B.
Road 1, Box 106B
Thomasville, PA 17364 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele
Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98909044.409.03.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998US04532
Priority number, dateUS1997081473107.03.1997         Original published format: US 814731
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9839224
Date:11.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015334
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1015334
Date:09.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:B65D25/04, B65D5/00, B65D5/48, B65D5/46, B65D5/02
[2004/18]
Former International [2000/27]B65D25/04, B65D5/46
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:STAPELBARER BEHÄLTER[2005/24]
English:STACKABLE CONTAINER[2000/27]
French:CONTENEUR EMPILABLE[2000/27]
Former [2000/27]Stapelbarer Behälter
Entry into regional phase06.10.1999National basic fee paid 
06.10.1999Search fee paid 
06.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
15.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2005Fee for grant paid
06.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
11.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
FR09.11.2005
IT09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
DE10.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT10.04.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/15]AT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
IT09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
DE10.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT10.04.2006
Former [2007/17]AT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
DE10.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT10.04.2006
Former [2007/02]AT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
DE10.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT10.04.2006
Former [2006/49]AT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT10.04.2006
Former [2006/46]AT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
Former [2006/36]AT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT09.11.2005
CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
Former [2006/33]CH09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
LI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
Former [2006/27]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
SE09.02.2006
Former [2006/24]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]DE8614293U  (GUSTAV STABERNACK GMBH) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2914235  (JONES CECIL T) [A] 1,11 * figures 1,5,6 *
International search[X]US3940053  (PUTMAN JACK D, et al);
 [X]US5413276  (SHEFFER PHIL B [US]);
 [Y]US4058249  (BUCK STANLEY EDWARD);
 [Y]US4101048  (RIEBEN HORACE JOHNNIE, et al);
 [Y]US4770339  (WEIMER CHARLES P [US]);
 [A]US5524815  (SHEFFER PHIL B [US]);
 [A]US2893621  (HARNISH DON P, et al)