Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968147

EP0968147 - ADDITIVE FOR PRODUCTION OF HIGHLY WORKABLE MORTAR CEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN.
7500 Grace Drive
Columbia, MD 21044 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN.
7500 Grace Drive
Columbia, Maryland 21044 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn.
Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, New York 10036 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ABELLEIRA, Angel
66 Musket Drive
Nashua, NH 03062 / US
02 / HALLOCK, John
10310 Coniston Ct.
Potomac, MD 20854-1900 / US
[2000/23]
Former [2000/01]01 / ABELLEIRA, Angel
66 Musket Drive
Nashua, NH 03062 / US
02 / HALLOCK, John
10324 Kingsbridge Road
Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US
Representative(s)Senior, Alan Murray , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Senior, Alan Murray , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98909083.210.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US04643
Priority number, dateUS1997082216521.03.1997         Original published format: US 822165
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842631
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968147
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968147
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:C04B24/24
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:ZUSATZ ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHUMFORMBAREM MÖRTELZEMENT[2000/01]
English:ADDITIVE FOR PRODUCTION OF HIGHLY WORKABLE MORTAR CEMENT[2000/01]
French:ADJUVANT PERMETTANT LA PRODUCTION DE CIMENT DE MORTIER TRES MANIABLE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Search fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
16.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2004Fee for grant paid
21.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
FR22.12.2004
IT22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
IE10.03.2005
LU10.03.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
SE22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
PT22.05.2005
[2008/15]
Former [2007/26]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
FR22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
IE10.03.2005
LU10.03.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
SE22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/17]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
FR22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
IE10.03.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
SE22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/32]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
FR22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
IE10.03.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/24]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
IE10.03.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/13]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/26]CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/25]CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI22.12.2004
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]US5328952  (BRODNYAN JOHN G [US], et al);
 [A]US5137571  (EISENHART ERIC K [US], et al)