Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990095

EP0990095 - SELF-STABILIZING, TRUE-TILTING PAD WITH ABRUPTLY-STEPPED POCKET FOR JOURNAL BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 23.04.2003  [2003/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WHM Holding Corporation
39 Princess Lane
Loudonville, NY 12211 / US
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, William, H.c/o WHM Holding Corporation
31 Schaffer Drive
Cohoes, NY 12047 / US
[2000/17]
Former [2000/14]01 / MILLER, William, H.
Apartment 512 515 Palm Valley Boulevard
Round Rock, TX 78664 / US
Representative(s)Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date98909197.018.03.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US05269
Priority number, dateUS1997082897931.03.1997         Original published format: US 828979
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844269
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990095
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16C17/03, F16C33/10
[2003/06]
Former International [2000/26]F16C32/06, F16C17/03
Former International [2000/14]F16C32/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/14]
TitleGerman:SELBSTSTABILISIERENDES LAGERKIPPSEGMENT MIT STEILE FLANKEN AUFWEISENDER TASCHE FÜR RADIALLAGER[2000/14]
English:SELF-STABILIZING, TRUE-TILTING PAD WITH ABRUPTLY-STEPPED POCKET FOR JOURNAL BEARING[2000/14]
French:PATIN VERITABLEMENT INCLINABLE, AUTO-STABILISANT, DOTE D'UNE POCHE A PAROI ABRUPTE, POUR PALIER LISSE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase27.10.1999National basic fee paid 
28.10.1999Search fee paid 
27.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
28.02.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US3687506  (DEE COLIN WILLIAM) [A] 1-22,27-33 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 42; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US5017022  (RUGGLES JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-13,15,16,18-22,27,28,31-33 * column 2, line 56 - column 5, line 26; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US5547287  (ZEIDAN FOUAD Y [US]) [A] 1,16-18,21-24,27,31,33 * column 8, line 37 - column 12, line 16; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]EP0420478  (CAPITAL FORMATION INC [US]) [A] 1-3,7,8,10,11,13,14,16-18,22,27,29-31 * page 4, line 40 - page 7, line 43; figures 1-11 *
International search[A]US5547287
 [A]US3807814
 [A]US2731305