Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971836

EP0971836 - VEHICLE FOR GLIDING OVER THE GROUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vontobel, Hansrudolf
Im Dorf 6
8704 Herrliberg / CH
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Frei, Alexandra Sarah
Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771
8032 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Frei, Alexandra Sarah
Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 768
8029 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date98909261.431.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998CH00121
Priority number, dateCH1997000075101.04.1997         Original published format: CH 75197
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843862
Date:08.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971836
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971836
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B62B13/04
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [2000/03]
TitleGerman:BODENGLEITFAHRZEUG[2000/03]
English:VEHICLE FOR GLIDING OVER THE GROUND[2000/03]
French:VEHICULE POUR GLISSER SUR LE SOL[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase30.09.1999National basic fee paid 
30.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
21.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
23.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
30.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2003Fee for grant paid
17.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR25.06.2003
IT25.06.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2006/14]FR25.06.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]US3917301  (FABRIS SERGIO) [X] 1-10,14,17-20 * column 3, line 4 - line 60; figure - *;
 [X]CH504876  (LEHNER ALBERT [CH]) [X] 1,2,18-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3633773  (SCHERER EMIL HERMANN [DE]) [X] 1,2,18-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3325179  (BISSETT FRED L) [X] 1,2,4-9,18-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4193609  (BISSETT FRED L [US]) [X] 1-10,18-20 * abstract *;
 [A]US4638896  (POYSER JOHN [GB]) [A] 11-15 * the whole document *