blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0968213 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0968213



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 171
26.11.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
15.01.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.12.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.11.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.11.2002 General authorisation Search / examination 1
21.11.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
21.11.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
24.07.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.07.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.07.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
14.05.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
14.05.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
14.05.2002 Description Search / examination 1
14.05.2002 General authorisation Search / examination 1
14.05.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
10.05.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.03.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.03.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.02.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.01.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.01.2002 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 6
15.01.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.01.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.09.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.09.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.08.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.08.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
25.08.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.11.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
11.08.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.08.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 33
09.04.1998 Priority document Search / examination 32