blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0968213


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.11.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.01.2004  [2004/03]
06.12.2002 (Expected) grant published on  22.01.2003  [2003/04]
30.11.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.07.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.05.2002 Examination report or reply
21.03.2002 Examination report or reply
01.03.2002 Renewal fee
22.02.2002 Change - applicant published on  10.04.2002  [2002/15]
21.01.2002 Examination report or reply
14.09.2001 First examination report
13.09.2001 Examination report or reply
05.01.2001 Renewal fee
27.12.1999 Renewal fee
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
19.11.1999 Request for examination filed published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
13.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
27.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication