blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0968213
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001511790Global Dossier 14.08.2001A
Priority number Date
EP9800649 04.02.1998
GB9702807 12.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0968213Global Dossier 22.01.2003B1
EP0968213 05.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP9800649 04.02.1998
GB9702807 12.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6395298 08.09.1998A
Priority number Date
EP9800649 04.02.1998
GB9702807 12.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2280100 11.07.2006C
CA2280100 20.08.1998A1
Priority number Date
EP9800649 04.02.1998
GB9702807 12.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69810907T 06.11.2003T2
DE69810907D 27.02.2003D1
Priority number Date
EP9800649 04.02.1998
GB9702807 12.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6211192 03.04.2001B1
Priority number Date
EP9800649 04.02.1998
GB9702807 12.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6420379 16.07.2002B1
Priority number Date
EP9800649 04.02.1998
GB9702807 12.02.1997
US35595299 12.08.1999
US71508300 20.11.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9835969Global Dossier 20.08.1998A1
Priority number Date
GB9702807 12.02.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2191283T 01.09.2003T3
Priority number Date
GB9702807 12.02.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9702807D 02.04.1997D0
Priority number Date
GB9702807 12.02.1997