Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968213

EP0968213 - ALKYNYL-SUBSTITUTED CAMPTOTHECINS AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.01.2004  [2004/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pharmacia Italia S.p.A.
Via Robert Koch 1.2
20152 Milano / IT
[2002/15]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Pharmacia & Upjohn S.p.A.
Niale Pasteur, 10
20014 Nerviano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / CANDIANI, Ilaria
Via del Chisso, 10
I-21052 Busto Arsizio / IT
02 / BEDESCHI, Angelo
Via Redaelli, 11
I-20146 Milano / IT
03 / VISENTIN, Giuseppina
Via Treviso, 3
I-20117 Rho / IT
04 / FAGNOLA, Maria, Chiara
Via C. Coppellotti, 4
I-29100 Piacenza / IT
05 / CAPOLONGO, Laura
Via P. Rembrandt, 11
I-20147 Milano / IT
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98909400.804.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP00649
Priority number, dateGB1997000280712.02.1997         Original published format: GB 9702807
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9835969
Date:20.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968213
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968213
Date:22.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D491/22, A61K31/44, // (C07D491/22, 311:00, 221:00, 221:00, 209:00)
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:DURCH ALKYNYL SUBSTITUIERTE CAMPTOTHECTINE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2000/01]
English:ALKYNYL-SUBSTITUTED CAMPTOTHECINS AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION[2000/01]
French:CAMPTOTHECINES A SUBSTITUTION ALKYNYL ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase25.08.1999National basic fee paid 
25.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
18.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
10.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2002Fee for grant paid
21.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9637496  (PHARMACIA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,6 * claims 1,6 *