Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0960506

EP0960506 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MONITORING AND INTERPRETATION OF APPLICATION PROTOCOLS FOR NETWORK DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 31.05.2006  [2006/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alasi di Arcieri Franco & C. S.A.S.
Via Mario Chiri 25
00171 Roma / IT
[1999/48]
Inventor(s)01 / ARCIERI, Franco
Via Mario Chiri, 25
I-00171 Roma / IT
02 / MARINELLI, Guido, Maria
Via Squillace, 108
I-00178 Roma / IT
03 / TALAMO, Maurizio
Via Emanuele Filiberto, 233
I-00185 Roma / IT
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Steinfl, Alessandro , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti Piazza di Pietra 39
00186 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/48]Steinfl, Alessandro , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti Piazza di Pietra 39
00186 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date98909469.316.02.1998
[1999/48]
WO1998EP00874
Priority number, dateIT1997RM0008617.02.1997         Original published format: IT RM970086
[1999/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9836532
Date:20.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0960506
Date:01.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998
[1999/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0960506
Date:04.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/26
[1999/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/48]
Extension statesSI14.07.1999
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND AUSWERTUNG VON ANWENDUNGSPROTOKOLLEN FÜR DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEME IN NETZEN[1999/48]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MONITORING AND INTERPRETATION OF APPLICATION PROTOCOLS FOR NETWORK DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS[1999/48]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE CONTROLER ET D'INTERPRETER DES PROTOCOLES D'APPLICATION DE RESEAUX DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES[1999/48]
Entry into regional phase14.07.1999National basic fee paid 
14.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.07.1999Examination requested  [1999/48]
12.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.2005Fee for grant paid
04.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
10.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200003   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
NL04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
PT17.10.2005
[2006/22]
Former [2006/14]CH04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
PT17.10.2005
Former [2006/13]DK04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
Former [2005/50]SE04.08.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]US5101402  (CHIU DAH-MING [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 3,5-7,9,11 * * column 3, line 24 - line 40 * * column 4, line 30 - line 56 * * column 5, line 30 - line 40 * * column 6, line 26 - column 8, line 10 * * column 9, line 10 - column 10, line 8 *;
 [A]EP0726664  (WANDEL & GOLTERMANN TECHN INC [US]) [A] 5,9 * column 2, line 27 - line 35 *
 [Y]  - SUNIL BHAT, "THE NETWORK ADVISOR ANALYSIS AND REAL-TIME ENVIRONMENT", HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, (19921001), vol. 43, no. 5, pages 29 - 33, XP000349771 [Y] 1-4,6-8 * page 29, column R, line 35 - page 30, column R, line 14 * * figure 2 * * page 31, column R, line 1 - line 12 *
 [Y]  - PRUFER R J, "NETWORK ADVISOR PROTOCOL ANALYSIS: DECODES", HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, (19921001), vol. 43, no. 5, pages 34 - 40, XP000349772 [Y] 1-4,6-8 * figures 1-4,8 * * page 35, column L, line 5 - column R, line 21 * * page 37, column L, line 1 - column R, line 19 * * page 38, column R, line 25 - line 41 *
 [A]  - JANDER M, "WAN PROTOCOL ANALYZERS", DATA COMMUNICATIONS, (19920401), vol. 21, no. 6, pages 69, 70, 72 - 78, 80, 82, XP000271123 [A] 1,6 * page 73 * * page 77 * * see page 78, "Decoding a WAN Analyzer" * * page 80, paragraph 4 *
 [A]  - KAFKA G, "PROTOKOLLANALYSATOREN", ELEKTRONIK, MUNICH (DE), (19870220), vol. 36, no. 4, pages 111 - 117, XP002071625 [A] 1,2,6 * figures 1-3 * * page 112, column L, line 48 - column R, line 15 * * page 115, column R, line 20 - page 117, column R, line 6 *