Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968347

EP0968347 - LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 22.02.2017  [2017/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Express-Lock Limited
112 Drews Lane, Ward End
Birmingham B8 2QF / GB
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / DYKE, Robert, William, Henry
186 Ward End Road, Ward End
Birmingham B8 2QZ / GB
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Moore, Christopher Mark , et al
Avidity IP
Kestrel House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Dowler, Edward Charles
Lawrence Shaw & Associates, 5th Floor, Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road, Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8TG / GB
Application number, filing date98909590.610.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998GB00707
Priority number, dateGB1997000506712.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9705067
GB1998000006905.01.1998         Original published format: GB 9800069
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840590
Date:17.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968347
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968347
Date:22.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:E05B63/20
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/03]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHLOSS[2000/01]
English:LOCK[2000/01]
French:SERRURE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase12.10.1999National basic fee paid 
12.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
12.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2002Fee for grant paid
04.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.01.2003
BE22.01.2003
FR22.01.2003
IT22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
IE10.03.2003
DK22.04.2003
PT22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
DE23.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
[2017/08]
Former [2008/15]AT22.01.2003
BE22.01.2003
FR22.01.2003
IT22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
IE10.03.2003
DK22.04.2003
PT22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
DE23.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2007/04]AT22.01.2003
BE22.01.2003
FR22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
IE10.03.2003
DK22.04.2003
PT22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
DE23.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/35]AT22.01.2003
BE22.01.2003
FR22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
GB22.04.2003
PT22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
DE23.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/22]AT22.01.2003
BE22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
GB22.04.2003
PT22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
DE23.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/10]AT22.01.2003
BE22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
PT22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
DE23.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/05]AT22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
PT22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
DE23.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/04]AT22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
PT22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/02]AT22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
PT22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
Former [2003/47]AT22.01.2003
NL22.01.2003
PT22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
Former [2003/43]NL22.01.2003
PT22.04.2003
SE22.04.2003
Former [2003/41]NL22.01.2003
SE22.04.2003
Former [2003/30]SE22.04.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US5247817  (KOERNER ALBRECHT ET AL) [A] 1,2,4-6,8 * column 3, line 11 - column 7, line 52; figure - *;
 [A]EP0547746  (CORBIN CO) [A] 1,2,4-6,8 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 36; figure - *;
 [A]GB241032  (PARSONS ET.AL.) [A] 1 * column 2, line 7 - line 80; figure - *;
 [A]US5092637  (MILLER KERMIT G) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]US3843174  (BOGUNOVICH R ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *