blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970056

EP0970056 - SUBSTITUTED 2-ANILINOPYRIMIDINES USEFUL AS PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LIMITED
208 Bath Road Slough
Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LIMITED
216 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 4EN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / DAVIS, Peter, David
10 Aston Park
Aston Rowant, Oxford OX9 5SW / GB
02 / HUTCHINGS, Martin, Clive
93 Roycroft Lane, Barkham
Wokingham, Berkshire RG40 4HN / GB
03 / MOFFAT, David, Festus, Charles
14 Lonsdale Way, Holyport
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 2YX / GB
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Hallybone, Huw George, et al
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98909633.413.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998GB00767
Priority number, dateGB1997000536114.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9705361
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9841512
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970056
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:C07D239/46, C07D401/12, A61K31/505
[2000/02]
CPC:
C07D239/47 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP); C07D401/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE 2-ANILINOPYRIMIDINEN WIRKSAM ALS PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITOREN[2000/02]
English:SUBSTITUTED 2-ANILINOPYRIMIDINES USEFUL AS PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS[2000/02]
French:2-ANILINOPYRIMIDINES SUBSTITUEES UTILISEES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTEINE KINASE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase08.10.1999National basic fee paid 
08.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
01.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/46]
10.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/46]
Request for further processing for:24.07.2002Request for further processing filed
24.07.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.08.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0135472  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1 * claim -; tables 1,4 *;
 [A]EP0172786  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1 * claim -; table 1 *;
 [A]EP0264348  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1 * claim -; tables 1,2 *;
 [PX]WO9719065  (CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1,10* page 71 - page 80; example 139 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.