Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983363

EP0983363 - PHOSPHATIDYL-3,4.5-TRIPHOSPHATE-DEPENDENT PROTEIN KINASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medical Research Council
20 Park Crescent
London W1B 1AL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/41]For all designated states
Medical Research Council
20 Park Crescent London
W1B 1AL / GB
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL
20 Park Crescent
London W1N 4AL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ALESSI, Dario, Renato
309 Perth Road
Dundee DD2 1LG / GB
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Pilkington, Stephanie Joan , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/41]Pilkington, Stephanie Joan , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2000/10]Miles, John Stephen , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date98909642.516.03.1998
[2000/10]
WO1998GB00777
Priority number, dateGB1997000546217.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9705462
GB1997001282619.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9712826
GB1997001725315.08.1997         Original published format: GB 9717253
US1997094366703.10.1997         Original published format: US 943667
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841638
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983363
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0983363
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/54, C12N9/12, C12N5/10, C07K16/40, C12Q1/48
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/10]
TitleGerman:PHOSPHATIDYL-3,4,5-TRIPHOSPHAT ABHÄNGIGE PROTEINKINASE[2000/10]
English:PHOSPHATIDYL-3,4.5-TRIPHOSPHATE-DEPENDENT PROTEIN KINASE[2000/10]
French:PROTEINE KINASE A ACTIVITE DEPENDANTE DU PHOSPHATIDYL-3,4.5-TRIPHOSPHATE[2000/10]
Entry into regional phase15.10.1999National basic fee paid 
15.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/10]
19.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2005Fee for grant paid
23.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT24.04.2006
[2007/17]
Former [2006/49]AT23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT24.04.2006
Former [2006/46]AT23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
Former [2006/24]FI23.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[DA]  - ALESSI D ET AL, "Mechanism of activation of protein kinase B by insulin and IGF-1", THE EMBO JOURNAL, (1996), vol. 15, no. 23, pages 6541 - 6551, XP002070051
 [A]  - ALESSI D ET AL, "Molecular basis for the substrate specificity of protein kinase B", FEBS LETTERS, (1996), vol. 399, pages 333 - 338, XP002070052 [A] 20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(96)01370-1
 [PX]  - ALESSI D R ET AL, "Characterization of a 3- phosphoinositide -dependent protein kinase which phosphorylates and activates protein kinase Balpha.", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (19970319), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 261 - 269, XP002070053 [PX] 1-36 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(06)00122-9
 [PX]  - ALESSI D R ET AL, "3-phosphoinositide-dependent protein kinase-1 (PDK1): Structural and functional homology with the Drosophila DSTPK61 kinase.", CURRENT BIOLOGY 7 (10). 1997. 776-789. ISSN: 0960-9822, (19970918), XP002070054 [PX] 1-36 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(06)00336-8
 [PX]  - STOKOE ET AL, "Dual role of phosphatidyl-3,4,5-triphosphate in the activation of protein kinase B", SCIENCE, (19970725), vol. 277, pages 567 - 570, XP002070055 [PX] 1-9,35,36 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5325.567
 [PA]  - HEMMINGS B A, "PtdIns(3,4,5)P3 gets its message across [comment].", SCIENCE, (19970725), vol. 277, page 534, XP002070056

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5325.534