Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0988055

EP0988055 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING FLEXIBLE PARTICLES, NON-IONIC SURFACTANT AND NON-IONIC CLOUD-POINT MODIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.06.2001 [2001/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NYCOMED IMAGING AS
Nycoveien 1-2
0401 Oslo 4 / NO
[2000/13]
Inventor(s)01 / NA, George, C., Nycomed Inc.
466 Devon Park Drive, P.O. Box 6630
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
02 / STEVENS, Jack, H., Nycomed Inc.
466 Devon Park Drive., P.O. Box 6630
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
03 / YUAN, Barbara, O., Nycomed Inc.
466 Devon Park Drive, P.O. Box 6630
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
04 / SIMMONS, Daryl, M., Nycomed Inc.
466 Devon Park Drive, P.O. Box 6630
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
05 / McINTIRE, Gregory, L., Nycomed Inc.
466 Devon ParkDrive, P.O. Box 6630
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Cockbain, Julian
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Cockbain, Julian, Dr.
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date98909643.316.03.1998
[2000/13]
WO1998GB00778
Priority number, dateGB1997000534014.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9705340
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841239
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0988055
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/13]
Search report(s)International search reportEP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/10, A61K47/26, A61K47/34
[2000/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/13]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND FLEXIBLE PARTIKEL, NICHT IONISCHE OBERFLÄCHENTENSIDE UND NICHT-IONISCHE TRÜBUNGSPUNKT-MODIFIKATOREN[2000/13]
English:COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING FLEXIBLE PARTICLES, NON-IONIC SURFACTANT AND NON-IONIC CLOUD-POINT MODIFIER[2000/13]
French:COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT DES PARTICULES SOUPLES, UN SURFACTANT NON IONIQUE ET UN MODIFICATEUR NON IONIQUE DE POINT DE TROUBLE[2000/13]
Entry into regional phase07.09.1999National basic fee paid 
07.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/13]
04.05.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0601619  (STERLING WINTHROP INC [US]) [X] 1-23 * page 5, line 26 - line 27 * * claims 1-11 *;
 [X]EP0602700  (STERLING WINTHROP INC [US]) [X] 1-23 * page 5, line 44 - line 56 * * claims 1-20 *;
 [X]EP0605024  (STERLING WINTHROP INC [US]) [X] 1-23 * page 5, line 38 - line 55 * * pages 1-9 *;
 [X]JPS6078916  ;
 [X]JPS6087222  ;
 [X]EP0592380  (PROCELL BIOTEKNIK AB [SE]) [X] 1-23 * claims 1-9 *
 [X]  - 1, vol. 85, no. 24, Database accession no. 85-144078, XP002069086 [X] 1-23 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850913), vol. 009, no. 228, Database accession no. (C - 303), [X] 1-23 * abstract *